WASHINGTON EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC.. et al v. HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: CHEVY CHASE EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC. and WASHINGTON EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC..
Defendant: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2020cv02119
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CHEVY CHASE EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC., WASHINGTON EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC.. (LaFon, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #18 Supplemental Memorandum; emailed to wdrake@steptoe.com, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. DO NOT REFILE - Counsel is reminded to select the court event for future submissions (zjf, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (See Docket Entry #18 to view document) (zjf)
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Drake, William)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Gordon on behalf of HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Gordon, Sarah)
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (See Docket Entry #16 to view document) (zjf)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Drake, William)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by WASHINGTON EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC.., CHEVY CHASE EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC. filed by WASHINGTON EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC.., CHEVY CHASE EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC.. (LaFon, Christopher)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Drake, William)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: According to Court records, counsel for Plaintiff Scott Howard Rome last renewed his membership in the bar of this Court in 2016, and because renewal is required every three years his membership is currently in provisional status. See Local Civil Rule 83.9(a), (c). It is hereby ORDERED that by October 9, 2020, Attorney Rome shall either renew his membership and file a notice of his renewal or withdraw his appearance on Plaintiff's behalf. It is FURTHER ORDERED that until Attorney Rome files such a notice of renewal, he shall not file any further pleadings in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/8/20. (lctjk2)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In this suit against Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Inc. and the District of Columbia, see ECF No. 1-1, it appears that there may not be diversity jurisdiction--the only basis for subject matter jurisdiction that Hartford Casualty provided to remove this case from Superior Court, see ECF No. 1 at 2--because the District of Columbia "is not considered a citizen" of a state for purposes of diversity jurisdiction, see Howerton v. Ogletree, 466 F. Supp. 2d 182, 184 (D.D.C. 2006). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) by September 18, 2020, Plaintiffs shall show cause why the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over their suit; (2) Defendants shall file their response by October 2, 2020; (3) Plaintiffs shall file their reply by October 9, 2020; and (4) Plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant Karl A. Racine, Attorney General of the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/1/20. (lctjk2)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHEVY CHASE EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC., WASHINGTON EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC... (LaFon, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Drake, William)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 Receipt on 08/10/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2020 CA 003035 B. (zjf)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of the Motion, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by August 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/10/20. (lctjk2)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 1 (Complaint) by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, William)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna R. Margolis on behalf of CHEVY CHASE EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC., WASHINGTON EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC. (See Docket Entry #7 to view document) (ztth)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/5/20. (lctjk2)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. LaFon and Scott Howard Rome on behalf of CHEVY CHASE EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC., WASHINGTON EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC.. (LaFon, Christopher); Modified text on 8/6/2020 (ztth).
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, )
August 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corrected LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re #3 Notice (Other) (Drake, William)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corrected Notice of Removal by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, (Drake, William)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Drake, William) Modified on 8/4/2020 to correct docket entry text (zmc).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William L. Drake on behalf of HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Drake, William)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2020 CA 003035B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7416956 filed by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D.C. Superior Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drake, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WASHINGTON EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC.. et al v. HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: William L. Drake
Represented By: Sarah Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHEVY CHASE EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Anna R. Margolis
Represented By: Christopher L. LaFon
Represented By: Scott Howard Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON EXECUTIVE SERVICES, INC..
Represented By: Anna R. Margolis
Represented By: Christopher L. LaFon
Represented By: Scott Howard Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?