AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION et al v. NATIONAL RAILWAY LABOR CONFERENCE et al
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS & AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO ("IAM"), TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION, BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION, TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM, BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION, NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN DIVISION/IBT RAIL CONFERENCE and BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN
Defendant: The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, SOO LINE RAILROAD COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORATION, INC., GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY, NATIONAL RAILWAY LABOR CONFERENCE, KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY doing business as CANADIAN NATIONAL RAILWAY and SOO LINE RAILROAD COMPANY doing business as CANADIAN PACIFIC RAILWAY
Case Number: 1:2020cv02139
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 ENTERED IN ERROR ON THE WRONG CASE.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/5/2020. (znbn) Modified on 9/18/2020 (znbn).
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; CSX TRANSPORATION, INC. waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; NATIONAL RAILWAY LABOR CONFERENCE waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; SOO LINE RAILROAD COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020; UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service - BNSF, #2 Waiver of Service - CSXT, #3 Waiver of Service - GTW, #4 Waiver of Service - KCS, #5 Waiver of Service - NSR, #6 Waiver of Service - Soo Line, #7 Waiver of Service - UPRR)(Grunert, John)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/6/2020. (lctnm3)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Grunert, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Grunert, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7429113) filed by TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN DIVISION/IBT RAIL CONFERENCE, AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION, BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS, BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN, NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS & AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO ("IAM"). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Roma, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION et al v. NATIONAL RAILWAY LABOR CONFERENCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOO LINE RAILROAD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILWAY LABOR CONFERENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY doing business as CANADIAN NATIONAL RAILWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOO LINE RAILROAD COMPANY doing business as CANADIAN PACIFIC RAILWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS & AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO ("IAM")
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN DIVISION/IBT RAIL CONFERENCE
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?