METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA v. RUTAS DE LIMA S.A.C.
Petitioner: METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA
Respondent: RUTAS DE LIMA S.A.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02155
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA. (Lowenstein, Andrew)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Form USM-272 - Ives Becerra, #3 Form USM-272 - Jaime Crosby Robinson, #4 Form USM-272 - Mara del Carmen Tovar, #5 Form USM-272A - Ives Becerra, #6 Form USM-272A - Jaime Crosby Robinson, #7 Form USM-272A - Mara del Carmen Tovar, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment, #11 Attachment, #12 Attachment, #13 Attachment, #14 Attachment, #15 Attachment, #16 Attachment, #17 Attachment, #18 Attachment, #19 Attachment, #20 Attachment, #21 Attachment, #22 Attachment, #23 Attachment, #24 Attachment, #25 Attachment, #26 Attachment, #27 Attachment, #28 Attachment, #29 Attachment, #30 Attachment, #31 Attachment, #32 Attachment, #33 Attachment, #34 Attachment, #35 Attachment, #36 Attachment, #37 Attachment, #38 Attachment, #39 Attachment, #40 Attachment, #41 Attachment, #42 Attachment, #43 Attachment, #44 Attachment, #45 Attachment, #46 Attachment, #47 Attachment, #48 Attachment, #49 Attachment)(Lowenstein, Andrew)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA re #1 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award,, . (Lowenstein, Andrew)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Alternative Means of Service and Stay of Proceedings. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/10/2020. (lckbj3, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay, Motion for Alternative Means of Service and Stay of Proceedings by METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Motion)(Lowenstein, Andrew). Added MOTION for Alternative Means of Service and Stay of Proceedings on 8/9/2020 (zjf).
August 7, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to RUTAS DE LIMA S.A.C. (zsb)
August 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA #1 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award,, filed by METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA. (Lowenstein, Andrew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD against RUTAS DE LIMA S.A.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7436289) filed by METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Kenneth Figueroa, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Affidavit of Dr. Mariela Gonzalez Espinoza, #16 Text of Proposed Order, #17 Notice of Petition, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lowenstein, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA v. RUTAS DE LIMA S.A.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: METROPOLITAN MUNICIPALITY OF LIMA
Represented By: Andrew B. Lowenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RUTAS DE LIMA S.A.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?