WILSON et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Plaintiff: SCOTT WILSON and KATHRYN NESTER
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Case Number: 1:2020cv02190
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (zsb)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Clerks Office shall direct the USMS to effect prompt service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/12/2020. (lcjeb2)
August 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this case randomly to a judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/11/20. (psu2)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Nathan Phelps on behalf of KATHRYN NESTER, SCOTT WILSON. (zmd)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KATHRYN NESTER, SCOTT WILSON. (zmd)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS filed by SCOTT WILSON, KATHRYN NESTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd)
August 4, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/4/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT WILSON
Represented By: Nathan Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN NESTER
Represented By: Nathan Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?