MAYS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS and OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
Case Number: 1:2020cv02197
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/7/2020. (DM)
September 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY with Jury Demand filed by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Compel; granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2020. (zsb)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $16.08 from Prison Account of JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2020. (zsb)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's motion #5 to enlarge the time to comply with the August 12, 2020 Order is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall submit the requisite financial information within 30 days from the filing date of this order, or risk dismissal of the case without prejudice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/24/20.(psu1)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS (zsb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS (zsb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit)(zsb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS (zsb)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/12/2020. (zsb)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS (zsb)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS (zsb)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY filed by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS.(zsb)
August 10, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/10/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAYS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?