CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE and U.S. POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
Case Number: 1:2020cv02256
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Dodge, Christopher)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' #11 Joint Status Report. The parties shall submit another joint status report by or before November 16, 2020, and every 30 days thereafter, until further notice from the Court.. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 15, 2020. (lcckk1)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2020. (dot)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint status report to address initial progress in this action by or before OCTOBER 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 1, 2020. (lcckk1)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL.(Dodge, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Dodge on behalf of All Defendants (Dodge, Christopher)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ztd)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 8/25/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/25/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/25/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/24/2020.) (Sus, Nikhel)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Postal Service, #2 Summons U.S. Postal Service Office of Inspector General)(Sus, Nikhel)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/27/2020. (DM)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Nikhel Sus on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON Substituting for attorney Anne L. Weismann (Sus, Nikhel)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY., SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons #2, #2 Summons #3, #3 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7471911) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Dep't of Treasury, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Weismann, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Represented By: Anne L. Weismann
Represented By: Nikhel Sus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?