RICHARDSON et al v. TRUMP et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS and GINA ARFI
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, LOUIS DEJOY and DONALD J. TRUMP
Case Number: 1:2020cv02262
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/8/2020. (lcegs3)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/8/2020. (lcegs3)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #26 Motion to Expedite Discovery, and granting #46 Motion to Expedite Discovery (Renewed). Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 "vests the trial judge with broad discretion to tailor discovery narrowly and to dictate the sequence of discovery." Watts v. SEC, 483 F.3d 501, 507 (D.C. Cir. 2007) (quoting Crawford-El v. Britton, 523 U.S. 574, 598 (1998)). Courts typically consider five factors when evaluating a motion for expedited discovery under the good-cause standard: "(1) whether a preliminary injunction is pending; (2) the breadth of the discovery requests; (3) the purpose for requesting the expedited discovery; (4) the burden on the defendants to comply with the requests; and (5) how far in advance of the typical discovery process the request was made." Guttenberg v. Emery, 26 F. Supp. 3d 88, 98 (D.D.C. 2014) (quoting In re Fannie Mae Derivative Litig., 227 F.R.D. 142, 14243 (D.D.C. 2005)). Courts are not limited to these factors, but the factors provide "guidelines for the exercise of the Court's discretion." Id. The Court finds that the good-cause standard is met here. First, plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is pending. Second, the Court has reviewed the discovery requests and has determined that they are narrow and carefully targeted to discover the facts necessary for plaintiffs to establish their claims and rebut anticipated defenses. Plaintiffs' discovery requests consist of three requests for production of documents. See ECF No. 46-1. Plaintiffs shall ensure that they do not request discovery that has already been provided by the defendants in similar actions before other court in Pennsylvania v. DeJoy, No. 20-cv-4096 (E.D. Pa.) and Washington v. Trump, No. 20-cv-3127 (E.D. Wash.). Third, the purpose for requesting the expedited discovery supports granting plaintiffs' motion given the imminence of the election. Fourth, while defendants contend that plaintiffs requests are overbroad and that will be burdensome on them to comply, their complaint that they need to "undergo yet another burdensome custodial document collection and review process" on an expedited basis in light of the expedited discovery in other similar cases is unpersuasive. Fifth, while the discovery requests here are being made in advance of the typical discovery process, this is appropriate given the imminence of the election. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that defendants shall serve any objections to plaintiffs' discovery requests by no later than October 7, 2020; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall produce all documents responsive to plaintiffs' discovery requests by no later than October 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2020. (lcegs3)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #61 joint motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/28/2020. (lcegs3) Modified to remove "minute" on 9/29/2020 (znmw).
September 25, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Supplemental Materials by LOUIS DEJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cholera, Kuntal)
September 25, 2020 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Berg, David)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #60 joint motion for protective order. The proposed order attached to #60 joint motion for protective order contains the case caption for Vote Forward v. DeJoy, 20-2405. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/25/2020. (lcegs3)
September 24, 2020 Filing 60 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (502(D)) by LOUIS DEJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Cholera, Kuntal)
September 22, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision and Order)(Berg, David)
September 22, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS. Case related to Case No. 20-6516. (Androphy, Joel)
September 20, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY to opposition to motion re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - USPS Equipment Reduction, #3 Exhibit B - Election Results by County, #4 Exhibit C - Grimmer Decl., #5 Exhibit D - Jones v. USPS Hearing Transcript, #6 Exhibit E - Hersh Decl., #7 Exhibit F - Goldway Decl, #8 Exhibit G - Green Decl.)(Berg, David)
September 16, 2020 Filing 56 REPLY to opposition to motion re #46 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Renewed) filed by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS. (Androphy, Joel)
September 15, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LOUIS DEJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Barber, Cintron, Curtis, #2 Declaration Colin, Couch, DeChambeau, Glass, Prokity, Vo, #3 Declaration Supplemental Cintron, Curtis, #4 Exhibit 1-15)(Cholera, Kuntal)
September 15, 2020 Filing 54 Supplemental STATUS REPORT by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Additional Exhibits)(Berg, David)
September 15, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #51 Status Report was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using their assigned login/password. (zjf)
September 14, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-2566. (James, Bronwyn) (Main Document 53 replaced on 9/16/2020) (znmw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE re #46 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Renewed) filed by LOUIS DEJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Cholera, Kuntal)
September 14, 2020 Filing 51 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Supplemental STATUS REPORT by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Additional Exhibits)(James, Bronwyn) Modified on 9/15/2020 (zjf).
September 11, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 20-2295, 20-2391, 20-2340, 20-4096, 20-2405. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Related Cases)(Androphy, Joel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by GINA ARFI, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interrogatory Responses, #2 Exhibit B - Redline of Original Complaint)(Androphy, Joel)
September 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Opposition due by 9/15/2020. Plaintiffs Reply due by 9/20/2020. (mac)
September 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Opposition due by 09/14/2020. Plaintiffs Reply due by 9/17/2020. (mac)
September 9, 2020 Filing 48 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/31/2020. (Androphy, Joel) Modified on 9/9/2020 to correct service date (zjf).
September 9, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #45 Status Report; emailed to jandrophy@bafirm.com, cc'd 9 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. DO NOT REFILE- FYI; signature and login/password must match for future filings (zjf, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #46 motion for expedited discovery, Defendants shall file their opposition by no later than September 14, 2020. Plaintiffs shall file their reply by no later than September 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/9/2020. (lcegs3)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #47 joint status report, in which the parties note their disagreements regarding a proposed briefing schedule on #14 Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, the parties shall adhere to the following schedule: (1) Defendants shall file their opposition by no later than September 15, 2020; and (2) Plaintiffs shall file their reply by no later than September 20, 2020. The Court declines to address the additional points raised in the joint status report as premature. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/9/2020. (lcegs3)
September 8, 2020 Filing 47 Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Court's September 5, 2020 Minute Order by CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit List)(Androphy, Joel)
September 8, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Renewed) by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised Requests for Production, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
September 8, 2020 Filing 45 STATUS REPORT re Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Pursuant to the Court's September 1, 2020 Minute Order by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS. (Androphy, Joel)
September 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/8/20. Objections due by 9/10/2020. 2020 (mac)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting #43 joint motion for entry of a protective order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/5/2020. (lcegs3)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that by September 10, 2020, Plaintiffs shall deliver to Chambers three printed courtesy copies of #14 Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. The parties may deliver their courtesy copies via overnight mail or by hand delivery to the Courthouse loading dock located at the corner of 3rd and C Streets, N.W. The courtesy copies must include the headers added by the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) System and be submitted in binders, three-hole punched, with single-sided pages. All exhibits shall be tabbed and indexed for ease of reference. The parties shall deliver to Chambers three courtesy copies of any future filing, including exhibits, in connection with #14 motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/5/2020. (lcegs3)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #39 and #42 responses to order to show cause, as well as the responses from parties in National Association for the Advancement of Colored People v. U.S. Postal Service, 20-2295; State of New York v. Trump, 20-2340; and Vote Forward v. DeJoy, 20-2405, the Court shall not consolidate the cases as related pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) and Local Civil Rule 40.5(a)(3). It is ORDERED that the parties shall coordinate schedules for discovery purposes to the extent possible. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/5/2020. (lcegs3)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #41 Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration, in which Plaintiffs note that Defendants object to the proposed briefing schedule but do not object to lifting the stay on briefing on #14 motion for preliminary injunction. The Court hereby VACATES the portion of the August 27, 2020 Minute Order staying briefing on #14 Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. The parties are directed to file a joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than September 8, 2020. The joint status report shall address a joint proposed expedited briefing schedule on #14 Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. To the extent possible, Plaintiffs shall also address the following in the joint status report: (1) suggested dates for an evidentiary hearing, including an estimate of the time length of said hearing; (2) the anticipated number of witnesses and the anticipated testimony length for each witness; (3) the scope of the proffered testimony for each anticipated witness; (4) lists of exhibits to be introduced at the evidentiary hearing, as well as copies of exhibits for opposing counsel and the Court; and (5) any evidentiary or factual stipulations to which the parties have agreed. See L. Civ. R. 65.1(d). This Order is subject to reconsideration for good cause shown by no later than September 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/5/2020. (lcegs3)
September 4, 2020 Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by LOUIS DEJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Cholera, Kuntal)
September 4, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, LOUIS DEJOY re Order,, filed by DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, LOUIS DEJOY. (Cholera, Kuntal)
September 3, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, re Stay of Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Preliminary Injunction by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Beginning Dates for Sending Ballots, #3 Exhibit B - Deadlines for Receipt of Ballots, #4 Exhibit C - May 29, 2020 Letter, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
September 2, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Quinn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Quinn, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by GINA ARFI, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL re Order,, filed by GINA ARFI, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL. (Androphy, Joel)
September 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Show Cause due no later than 12:00PM on 9/4/2020. (mac)
September 1, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Bronwyn James on behalf of All Plaintiffs (James, Bronwyn)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, directs the parties to show cause why this action should not be consolidated as related with National Association for the Advancement of Colored People v. U.S. Postal Service, 20-2295; State of New York v. Trump, 20-2340; and Vote Forward v. DeJoy, 20-2405 by no later than September 4, 2020 at 12:00 PM. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) (permitting the court to consolidate actions "involv[ing] a common question of law or fact"); Local Civ. R. 40.5(a)(3) (defining related civil actions). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/1/2020. (lcegs3)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #37 joint motion for adjournment of briefing. The portion of the Minute Order of August 27, 2020 setting the briefing schedule for #26 motion for expedited discovery is hereby VACATED. Plaintiffs are directed to file a status report informing the Court of whether they seek to renew their motion by no later than September 8, 2020. If the Motion for Expedited Discovery is renewed, Defendants shall file their opposition to the #26 motion for expedited discovery by no later than September 11, 2020, and Plaintiffs shall file their reply by no later than September 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/1/2020. (lcegs3)
August 31, 2020 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Adjournment of Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery re Order,, #26 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS. Case related to Case No. 20-3127. (Androphy, Joel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by David Howard Berg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Berg, David)
August 28, 2020 Filing 34 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 8/25/2020 (Androphy, Joel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 33 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/25/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/24/2020. (Androphy, Joel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 32 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LOUIS DEJOY served on 8/25/2020 (Androphy, Joel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 31 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Androphy, Joel) Modified on 8/28/2020 (zjf).
August 28, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of filing Redacted Response to Court's August 18, 2020 Order to Show Cause by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Redacted Response)(Androphy, Joel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Redacted Declarations by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Redacted Richardson Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex, 2 - Redacted Carroll Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Redacted Arfi Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Redacted Zygas Declaration)(Androphy, Joel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing Redacted Complaint by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Redacted Complaint)(Androphy, Joel)
August 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs Redacted Documents due by 9/1/2020. (mac)
August 28, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #31 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (See Docket Entry #32 to view document) (zjf)
August 27, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Page Berg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Berg, Kathryn)
August 27, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Requests, #3 Exhibit 2 - Interrogatory, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 25 Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Court's August 21, 2020 Minute Order by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS. (Androphy, Joel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kuntal Virendra Cholera on behalf of All Defendants (Cholera, Kuntal) (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/27/2020) (zjf).
August 27, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #25 Status Report; emailed to jandrophy@bafirm.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Signing Attorney has been granted phv and needs to enter an appearance. Or, the filing willing be entered in error (zjf, )
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 motion to place under seal Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's August 18, 2020 Order to Show Cause ("OTSC Response") and Plaintiffs' Motion to Place Under Seal Plaintiffs' Original Complaint in Accordance with Local Rule 5.1(h) and to Waive Local Rule 5.1(c) ("Motion to Waive"). Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.1(h), Plaintiffs may file their OTSC Response and Motion to Waive under seal. However, given the strong presumption in favor of public access to judicial records, see, e.g., Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns, Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 597 (1978) ("It is clear that the courts of this country recognize a general right to inspect and copy public records and documents, including judicial records and documents."), and the ease with which confidential and proprietary information may be redacted from documents before they are filed publicly, Plaintiffs are directed to file a redacted version of their sealed OTSC Response and Motion to Waive on the public record within five business days of this Order. Plaintiffs are cautioned that redactions shall be made solely to the extent necessary to preserve the confidential or proprietary nature of the relevant information. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/27/2020. (lcegs3)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 , #10 motion to place under seal Plaintiffs' Original Complaint. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.1(h), Plaintiffs may file their Original Complaint under seal. However, given the strong presumption in favor of public access to judicial records, see, e.g., Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns, Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 597 (1978) ("It is clear that the courts of this country recognize a general right to inspect and copy public records and documents, including judicial records and documents."), and the ease with which confidential and proprietary information may be redacted from documents before they are filed publicly, Plaintiffs are directed to file a redacted version of their sealed Original Complaint on the public record within five business days of this Order. Plaintiffs are cautioned that redactions shall be made solely to the extent necessary to preserve the confidential or proprietary nature of the relevant information. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/27/2020. (lcegs3)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #25 joint status report and #26 motion for expedited discovery, the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendants shall file their opposition to the #26 motion for expedited discovery by no later than September 3, 2020. Plaintiffs shall file their reply by no later than September 8, 2020. Briefing on #14 motion for preliminary injunction is HEREBY STAYED pending the Court's ruling on #26 motion for expedited discovery, subject to reconsideration for good cause shown by no later than September 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/27/2020. (lcegs3)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 , #12 motion to redact. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.1(h), Plaintiffs may file Plaintiffs' Declarations and Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for a Preliminary Injunction under seal. However, given the strong presumption in favor of public access to judicial records, see, e.g., Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns, Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 597 (1978) ("It is clear that the courts of this country recognize a general right to inspect and copy public records and documents, including judicial records and documents."), and the ease with which confidential and proprietary information may be redacted from documents before they are filed publicly, Plaintiffs are directed to file a redacted version of Plaintiffs' Declarations and Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for a Preliminary Injunction on the public record within five business days of this Order. Plaintiffs are cautioned that redactions shall be made solely to the extent necessary to preserve the confidential or proprietary nature of the relevant information. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/27/2020. (lcegs3)
August 26, 2020 Filing 23 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David Berg, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-7509742. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline Motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of David Berg, #3 Declaration Redline Declaration of David Berg, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #23 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. David Berg is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/26/2020. (lcegs3)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #20 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Kathryn P. Berg is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/25/2020. (lcegs3)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Bronwyn M. James is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/25/2020. (lcegs3)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. James Quinn is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/25/2020. (lcegs3)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #22 notice of errata, the parties are reminded to communicate with the Court in writing by motion. See Standing Order, ECF No. 6. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/25/2020. (lcegs3)
August 24, 2020 Filing 22 ERRATA by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS Order on Motion for Leave to Appear, Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Motion for David H. Berg to appear pro hac vice - corrected, #2 Declaration of David H. Berg, #3 Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bronwyn M. James, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7502365. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - Declaration of Bronwyn M. James, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathryn P. Berg, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7502350. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - Declaration of Kathryn P. Berg, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James W. Quinn, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7502344. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James W. Quinn, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zjf)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #17 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c) ("Each motion... shall be accompanied by a proposed order."). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/24/2020. (lcegs3)
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear David Berg Pro Hac Vice, MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David Berg, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number CDCDC-7495107. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 B)(Androphy, Joel)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GINA ARFI, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL.(Androphy, Joel)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #5 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2(d) ("Any attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must file a motion signed by a sponsoring member of the Bar of this Court, accompanied by a declaration by the non-member...."). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/21/2020. (lcegs3)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #14 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, plaintiffs are HEREBY DIRECTED to contact forthwith the United States Attorneys Office for the District of Columbia and/or the Department of Justice as appropriate to identify government counsel. The parties shall thereafter file a joint status report by no later than August 27, 2020 at 12:00 PM NOON with recommendations for further proceedings, including, inter alia, (1) whether plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction should be consolidated with the merits under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65; and (2) recommendations for further proceedings including, if necessary, a briefing schedule for plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/21/2020. (lcegs3)
August 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due no later than 12:00PM on 8/27/2020 (mac)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT (Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction) filed by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4)(Androphy, Joel) Modified event title on 8/25/2020 (znmw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT (Response to Order to Show Cause) filed by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Androphy, Joel) Modified event title on 8/25/2020 (znmw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Androphy, Joel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Redact Plaintiffs' Declarations and Exhibits in Support of Application for a Preliminary Injunction and to Seal Unredacted Declarations and Exhibits by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Supplement)(Androphy, Joel). Added MOTION to Seal on 8/25/2020 (znmw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Androphy, Joel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Waive Local Rule 5.1(c), MOTION to Seal #1 Compliant by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel). Added MOTION to Seal Document on 8/25/2020 (znmw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION Seal Plaintiffs' Response to August 18, 2020 Order to Show Cause and Motion to file Original Complaint Under Seal by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Androphy, Joel) Modified on 8/24/2020 to correct docket event/text (zjf).
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Response to August 18, 2020 Order to Show Cause and Motion to file Original Complaint Under Seal by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel) Modified event on 8/25/2020 (znmw).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/19/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David H. Berg, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7477819. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - David Berg, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ERRATA - Aida Zygas by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS Notice of Corrected Docket Entry. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Donald J. Trump, #4 Summons DeJoy, #5 Summons USPS)(Androphy, Joel) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/31/2020) (znmw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA - Aida Zygas by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS #1 Complaint, filed by GINA ARFI, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL, AIDA ZARGAS, TERESA RICHARDSON. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Donald J. Trump, #4 Summons Louis DeJoy, #5 Summons USPS)(Androphy, Joel) Modified on 8/18/2020 (zmd).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to LOUIS DEJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, )
August 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #3 Errata, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (zmd)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is aware that the addresses of the plaintiffs have been redacted in the complaint filed in this case. See ECF No. 4-1. However, counsel have not filed a Motion to Waive Local Civil Rule 5.1 (c), which provides in relevant part that "[t]he first filing by or on behalf of a party shall have in the caption the name and full residence address of the party." Furthermore, the complaint is styled "Plaintiffs' Original Complaint and Request for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctions." See ECF No. 4-1. Local Civil Rule 65.1(c) provides in relevant part that "[a]n application for a preliminary injunction shall be made in a document separate from the complaint." Counsel for plaintiffs are HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, by no later than August 20, 2020, why they should not be held in contempt of court for failure to comply with the Local Civil Rules of this court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/18/2020. (lcegs1)
August 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs Show Cause due by 8/20/2020. (mac)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CDCDC-7472661) filed by GINA ARFI, TERESA RICHARDSON, AIDA ZARGAS, CHRISTOPHER CARROLL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Androphy, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDSON et al v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CARROLL
Represented By: Joel M. Androphy
Represented By: Bronwyn James
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: David Howard Berg
Represented By: Kathryn Page Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA RICHARDSON
Represented By: Joel M. Androphy
Represented By: Bronwyn James
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: David Howard Berg
Represented By: Kathryn Page Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDA ZARGAS
Represented By: Joel M. Androphy
Represented By: Bronwyn James
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: David Howard Berg
Represented By: Kathryn Page Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA ARFI
Represented By: Joel M. Androphy
Represented By: Bronwyn James
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: David Howard Berg
Represented By: Kathryn Page Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS DEJOY
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?