DIAZ v. ROSARIO CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: IVAN DIAZ
Defendant: ROSARIO CORPORATION and ABDELILAH SOUADA
Case Number: 1:2020cv02274
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Consent Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the initial scheduling conference set for November 5, 2020, is RESCHEDULED for November 9, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. via teleconference. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. Further, the parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at least one business day prior to the hearing at (202) 354-3495 to make arrangements to participate. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/7/2020. (lctjk1)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by IVAN DIAZ (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Order for Mediation)(Lyford-Pike, Roy)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for November 5, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. via teleconference. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. Further, the parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at least one business day prior to the hearing at (202) 354-3495 to make arrangements to participate. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/6/2020. (lctjk1)
October 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ROSARIO CORPORATION, ABDELILAH SOUADA.(Wilson, Albert)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ABDELILAH SOUADA served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020 (Zipin, Philip)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROSARIO CORPORATION served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020 (Zipin, Philip)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Wilson, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Wilson, Albert)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/2/2020. (lctjk1)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ROSARIO CORPORATION, ABDELILAH SOUADA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
August 19, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROSARIO CORPORATION and ABDELILAH SOUADA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7478931) filed by IVAN DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Rosario Corporation, #3 Summons Summons for Souada)(Lyford-Pike, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIAZ v. ROSARIO CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSARIO CORPORATION
Represented By: Albert Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDELILAH SOUADA
Represented By: Albert Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IVAN DIAZ
Represented By: Roy Lyford-Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?