VECCHIONI v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: MICHAEL VECCHIONI
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) and AMTRAK
Case Number: 1:2020cv02277
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:Initial disclosures shall be exchanged by October 29, 2020. Any other parties shall be joined or the pleadings amended by December 14, 2020. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be due by April 29, 2021. Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be due by May 28, 2021. Plaintiff's rebuttal expert disclosures shall be due by June 11, 2021. Rule 26(e)(2) supplementation of expert disclosures and responses shall be due by July 2, 2021. Discovery shall close, excluding de bene esse depositions, by August 16, 2021. Status Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court ORDERS that (1) Initial disclosures shall be exchanged by October 29, 2020; (2) Any other parties shall be joined or the pleadings amended by December 14, 2020; (3) Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be due by April 29, 2021; (4) Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be due by May 28, 2021; (5) Plaintiff's rebuttal expert disclosures shall be due by June 11, 2021; (6) Rule 26(e)(2) supplementation of expert disclosures and responses shall be due by July 2, 2021; (7) Discovery shall close, excluding de bene esse depositions, by August 16, 2021; and (8) A post-discovery status hearing is scheduled for August 30, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 25. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/15/2020. (lcjeb2)
October 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2020. Post Discovery Status Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Jan Dickman) (nbn)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Ezeigbo, Ifeanyi)
September 16, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for October 15, 2020, at 10:00 am. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/16/2020. (lcjeb2)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Ezeigbo, Ifeanyi)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(Ezeigbo, Ifeanyi)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020 (Duckworth, James) Modified dates on 9/1/2020 (znmw).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7481661) filed by MICHAEL VECCHIONI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Duckworth, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VECCHIONI v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL VECCHIONI
Represented By: James M. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Ifeanyi Olusegun Ezeigbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMTRAK
Represented By: Ifeanyi Olusegun Ezeigbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?