DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Case Number: 1:2020cv02283
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Report due by 10/26/2020. (mac)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than October 26, 2020. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s), if any, for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/28/2020. (lcegs2)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Tilghman, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/27/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/27/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/26/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 8/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Annatoyn, Travis)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/20/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit1) (mac)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
August 20, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Annatoyn, Travis)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7482825) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Annatoyn, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Represented By: Travis James Annatoyn
Represented By: Travis Annatoyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Michael A. Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?