NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
Defendant: LOUIS DEJOY and UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Amicus Curiae: JACK REED, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, TOM CARPER, CORY A. BOOKER, BERNARD SANDERS, RON WYDEN, JEFFREY A. MERKLEY, MAZIE K. HIRONO, EDWARD J. MARKEY, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, SHERROD BROWN, AMY KLOBUCHAR, JEANNE SHAHEEN and UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Case Number: 1:2020cv02295
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Referring Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2020 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/10/2020. (lcegs1)
October 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/10/2020. (lcegs1)
September 30, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Zieve, Allison)
September 27, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Supplemental Materials by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Operating Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - Stand-Up Talk, #3 Exhibit C - Additional Election-Mail Resources)(Borson, Joseph)
September 22, 2020 Filing 28 AMICUS BRIEF by UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (zjf)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #20 motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiff by UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/22/2020. (lcegs3)
September 22, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Zieve, Allison)
September 18, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Zieve, Allison)
September 16, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison Zieve, #2 Declaration (Second) of Earl Graham)(Zieve, Allison)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #23 unopposed motion to file supplemental declarations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/16/2020. (lcegs3)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #24 unopposed motion to file supplemental declarations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/16/2020. (lcegs3)
September 15, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cintron (Supp.), #2 Declaration Curtis (Supp.), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Borson, Joseph)
September 15, 2020 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations in Support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zieve, Allison)
September 11, 2020 Filing 21 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Declaration (Barber, Citron, Curtis), #3 Declaration (Colin, Couch, DeChambeau, Glass, Prokity, Vo), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Borson, Joseph)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff by UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of U.S. House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
September 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Opposition due no later than 12:00PM on 9/11/2020. Plaintiff Reply due by 9/16/2020. (mac)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 AMICUS BRIEF by RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CORY A. BOOKER, SHERROD BROWN, TOM CARPER, MAZIE K. HIRONO, AMY KLOBUCHAR, EDWARD J. MARKEY, JEFFREY A. MERKLEY, JACK REED, BERNARD SANDERS, JEANNE SHAHEEN, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, RON WYDEN. (zjf)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #18 motion for leave to file amici curiae brief by MEMBERS OF CONGRESS. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/9/2020. (lcegs3)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #17 joint status report, the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule on #8 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction: (1) Defendants shall file their opposition by September 11, 2020 at 12:00 PM; and (2) Plaintiff shall file its reply by no later than September 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/9/2020. (lcegs3)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff by RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CORY A. BOOKER, SHERROD BROWN, TOM CARPER, MAZIE K. HIRONO, AMY KLOBUCHAR, EDWARD J. MARKEY, Jeffrey A. Merkley, JACK REED, BERNARD SANDERS, JEANNE SHAHEEN, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, RON WYDEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of Members of Congress as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gorod, Brianne)
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE. (Zieve, Allison)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 joint motion for entry of a protective order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/5/2020. (lcegs3)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #11 and #13 responses to order to show cause, as well as the responses from parties in Richardson v. Trump, 20-2262; State of New York v. Trump, 20-2340; and Vote Forward v. DeJoy, 20-2405, the Court shall not consolidate the cases as related pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) and Local Civil Rule 40.5(a)(3). It is ORDERED that the parties shall coordinate schedules for discovery purposes to the extent possible. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/5/2020. (lcegs3)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that by September 10, 2020, Plaintiff shall deliver to Chambers three printed courtesy copies of #8 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. The parties may deliver their courtesy copies via overnight mail or by hand delivery to the Courthouse loading dock located at the corner of 3rd and C Streets, N.W. The courtesy copies must include the headers added by the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) System and be submitted in binders, three-hole punched, with single-sided pages. All exhibits shall be tabbed and indexed for ease of reference. The parties shall deliver to Chambers three courtesy copies of any future filing, including exhibits, in connection with #8 motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/5/2020. (lcegs3)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Borson, Joseph)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/04/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhiibit 1) (mac)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE re Order,, filed by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Cholera, Kuntal)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kuntal Virendra Cholera on behalf of All Defendants (Cholera, Kuntal) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/4/2020) (zjf).
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE re Order,, to show cause why this action should not be consolidated filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE. (Zieve, Allison)
September 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Show Cause due no later than 12:00PM on 9/4/2020. (mac)
September 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due no later than 12:00PM on 9/8/2020. (mac)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #8 motion for preliminary injunction, the parties shall file a joint status report by no later than September 8, 2020 at 12:00 PM with recommendations for further proceedings, including, inter alia, (1) whether the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People's ("NAACP") motion for a preliminary injunction should be consolidated with the merits under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65; and (2) recommendations for further proceedings including, if necessary, a briefing schedule for NAACP's motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/1/2020. (lcegs3)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, directs the parties to show cause why this action should not be consolidated as related with Richardson v. Trump, 20-2262; State of New York v. Trump, 20-2340; and Vote Forward v. DeJoy, 20-2405 by no later than September 4, 2020 at 12:00 PM. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) (permitting the court to consolidate actions "involv[ing] a common question of law or fact"); Local Civ. R. 40.5(a)(3) (defining related civil actions). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/1/2020. (lcegs3)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Case directly reassigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan as related. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Borson, Joseph)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Declaration of Carmen Watkins, #3 Declaration Declaration of Earl Graham, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Zieve, Allison)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/27/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/26/2020. (Zieve, Allison)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE. Case related to Case No. 20-2262. (Zieve, Allison)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 20-2340. (Zieve, Allison)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Spital on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Spital, Samuel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
August 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Zieve, Allison)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7486929) filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE. (Attachments: #1 Summons to USPS, #2 Summons to US Attorney's Office, #3 Summons to Louis DeJoy, #4 Summons to Attorney General, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zieve, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS DEJOY
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
Represented By: Allison Marcy Zieve
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JACK REED
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELIZABETH WARREN
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SHELDON WHITEHOUSE
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TOM CARPER
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CORY A. BOOKER
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BERNARD SANDERS
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RON WYDEN
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEFFREY A. MERKLEY
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAZIE K. HIRONO
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EDWARD J. MARKEY
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RICHARD BLUMENTHAL
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SHERROD BROWN
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMY KLOBUCHAR
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEANNE SHAHEEN
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?