JENKINS v. DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER MASSACHUSETTS et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS KEVIN JENKINS
Defendant: FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION MASSACHUSETTS and DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER MASSACHUSETTS
Case Number: 1:2020cv02305
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by THOMAS KEVIN JENKINS. (zmd)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/24/2020. (zmd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by THOMAS KEVIN JENKINS. (zmd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by THOMAS KEVIN JENKINS. (zmd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER MASSACHUSETTS, FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION MASSACHUSETTS filed by THOMAS KEVIN JENKINS. (zmd)
August 18, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/18/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENKINS v. DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER MASSACHUSETTS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION MASSACHUSETTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER MASSACHUSETTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS KEVIN JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?