ALLIANCE PARTY et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE PARTY and ROQUE DE LA FUENTE
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Case Number: 1:2020cv02319
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/5/2020. (znbn)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bluming, Micah)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #14 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by November 5, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/17/2020. (lcjeb2)
September 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Preliminary Injunction held on 9/3/2020 re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ROQUE DE LA FUENTE, ALLIANCE PARTY, Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2020 re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ROQUE DE LA FUENTE, ALLIANCE PARTY. Oral arguments heard and motion DENIED, for the reasons stated on the record. (Court Reporter Lisa Grififith.) (znbn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALLIANCE PARTY, ROQUE DE LA FUENTE. (Dunlap, Thomas)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bluming, Micah)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul A. Rossi, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7542323. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIANCE PARTY, ROQUE DE LA FUENTE (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunlap, Thomas)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #5 Certificate of Service was entered in error and will be refiled by the Clerk's Office. (eg)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of PAUL A. ROSSI. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/02/2020. (lcjeb2)
September 1, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: TRO/Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/3/2020 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: After discussions with the parties, the Court ORDERS that a telephonic hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order shall take place on September 3, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. Chambers will contact the parties with dial-in information. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/1/2020. (lcjeb1)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS served on 8/31/2020 (eg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shani Brown on behalf of All Defendants (Brown, Shani)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah Ian Bluming on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS (Bluming, Micah)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben S. Barlow on behalf of ALLIANCE PARTY, ROQUE DE LA FUENTE (Barlow, Ben)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLIANCE PARTY, ROQUE DE LA FUENTE re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Dunlap, Thomas)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLIANCE PARTY, ROQUE DE LA FUENTE re #3 Summons Issued Electronically, #2 Errata Complaint. (Dunlap, Thomas) Modified on 9/2/2020 (eg).
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by ALLIANCE PARTY, ROQUE DE LA FUENTE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunlap, Thomas). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 8/31/2020 (zrdj).
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by ALLIANCE PARTY, ROQUE DE LA FUENTE #1 Complaint, filed by ROQUE DE LA FUENTE, ALLIANCE PARTY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunlap, Thomas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7495544) filed by ALLIANCE PARTY, ROQUE DE LA FUENTE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dunlap, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLIANCE PARTY et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: Micah Ian Bluming
Represented By: Shani C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE PARTY
Represented By: Thomas Mansfield Dunlap
Represented By: Ben S. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROQUE DE LA FUENTE
Represented By: Thomas Mansfield Dunlap
Represented By: Ben S. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?