UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 280 VIRTUAL CURRENCY ACCOUNTS
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: 280 VIRTUAL CURRENCY ACCOUNTS
Case Number: 1:2020cv02396
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Brodie Brown on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Brown, Christopher)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Camille Brooks on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Brooks, Jessica)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jessica Camille Brooks on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Zia Mustafa Faruqui (Brooks, Jessica)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 WARRANT for Arrest In Rem Issued. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/21/2020. (lctjk1)
September 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Faruqui, Zia)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/2/2020. (lctjk1)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-606. (Faruqui, Zia)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 280 VIRTUAL CURRENCY ACCOUNTS (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Faruqui, Zia)
August 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 280 VIRTUAL CURRENCY ACCOUNTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 280 VIRTUAL CURRENCY ACCOUNTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Zia Mustafa Faruqui
Represented By: Jessica Camille Brooks
Represented By: Christopher Brodie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?