SHERPA v. TRUMP et al
Plaintiff: DAWA SHERPA
Defendant: WILLIAM O'BRYANT, MATTHEW ALBENCE, CHAD WOLF, DIANNE WITTE, JOHNATHON HORTON, BRYAN S. PITTMAN, WILLIAM BARR and DONALD J. TRUMP
Case Number: 1:2020cv02443
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement (Other)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Alabama, pursuant to the Court Order entered 09/09/2020. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zmc) (zmc).
October 9, 2020 Receipt on 10/09/2020 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 4:20-cv-01592 sent by Northern District of Alabama. (zrdj)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of Alabama. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/09/2020. (zsb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Oral Argument by DAWA SHERPA. (zmd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAWA SHERPA. (zmd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DAWA SHERPA. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Affidavit In Support of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order with Exhibits) (zmd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, JOHNATHON HORTON, WILLIAM O'BRYANT, BRYAN S. PITTMAN, DONALD J. TRUMP, DIANNE WITTE, CHAD WOLF with Jury Demand filed by DAWA SHERPA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd)
August 28, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/28/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHERPA v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM O'BRYANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW ALBENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANNE WITTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNATHON HORTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN S. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWA SHERPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?