DURAN v. U.S. CONGRESS et al
Plaintiff: DAVID DURAN
Defendant: STATE LEGISLATIVE and U.S. CONGRESS
Case Number: 1:2020cv02548
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by DAVID DURAN (zsb)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by DAVID DURAN (zsb)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID DURAN (zsb)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/21/2020. (zsb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DAVID DURAN (zsb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID DURAN (zsb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STATE LEGISLATIVE, U.S. CONGRESS filed by DAVID DURAN. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(zsb)
September 9, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 09/09/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DURAN v. U.S. CONGRESS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE LEGISLATIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CONGRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID DURAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?