MZ-DC, INC v. ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: MS-DC, INC and MZ-DC, INC individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated doing business as DC PIZZA
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY and ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Case Number: 1:2020cv02651
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Local Civil Rule 83.2(d) requires attorneys seeking admission pro hac vice to include "a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline." Attorney Adam J. Kaiser states that there are no disciplinary complaints pending against him for violation of the rules of the courts of the State of New York, and that he has not been suspended or disbarred for disciplinary reasons from practice in any court, but he does not certify whether he has been disciplined in any way by any bar. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that his #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/13/2020. (lctjk3)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam J. Kaiser, :Firm- Alston & Bird LLP, :Address- 90 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10016, : Phone No. - 212-210-9465 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7703357. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Adam J. Kaiser in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kang, Edward)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/29/2020. (lctjk3)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
September 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by MS-DC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Slocumb, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT MZ-DC, Inc. d/b/a DC Pizza against ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7615569) filed by MS-DC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Slocumb, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MZ-DC, INC v. ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MS-DC, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MZ-DC, INC individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated doing business as DC PIZZA
Represented By: Michael Slocumb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?