PITT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. v. AZAR
Plaintiff: PITT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv02673
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/13/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/12/2020. (Webster, Stephanie)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/19/2020. (Webster, Stephanie)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 10/19/2020 (Webster, Stephanie)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Cirino, Paul)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/30/2020. (DM)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
September 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PITT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. (Webster, Stephanie)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7617602) filed by PITT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PITT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PITT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?