INOGEN, INC. v. AZAR et al
Plaintiff: INOGEN, INC.
Defendant: SEEMA VERMA, PALMETTO GBA, LLC and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv02675
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PALMETTO GBA, LLC. Attorney Joseph Alexander Ward terminated. (Ward, Joseph)
November 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/24/2020 Replies due by 12/14/2020. Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss due by 1/7/2021. (zcal)
November 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 14, 2020. (lccjn2)
November 10, 2020 Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALEX M. AZAR, II, PALMETTO GBA, LLC, SEEMA VERMA. (Seabrook, April)
November 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of PALMETTO GBA, LLC (Seabrook, April)
November 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/10/2020. (zcal)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. After review of Plaintiff's #1 Complaint and #20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that by 5:00 PM on November 10, 2020, the Parties shall meet, confer, and file a Joint Status Report addressing the following issues: (1) a proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiff's #20 Motion; (2) a statement addressing whether a hearing on the Motion is necessary, and if so, a proposed date for such a hearing; and (3) a statement addressing whether the Parties anticipate factual disputes between declarants, and if so, a statement addressing whether the Parties believe an evidentiary hearing will be necessary to resolve the disputes and a proposal for proceeding with such a hearing, see LCvR 65.1(d). The Parties may also address any other issues that they believe will be helpful to the Court. Any disagreements should be noted in the Joint Status Report. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 6, 2020. (lccjn2)
November 6, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; emailed to kbuncedefilipp@foleyhoag.com, cc'd 12 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. Attorney signature must match login/password for future fillings. (zeg, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Proposed Order by INOGEN, INC. re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (DeFilipp, Kristyn) Modified docket event/text on 11/6/2020 (eg).
November 5, 2020 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Statement of Points and Authorities to re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by INOGEN, INC. (DeFilipp, Kristyn) Modified docket event/text on 11/6/2020 (eg).
November 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by INOGEN, INC. (DeFilipp, Kristyn)
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristyn DeFilipp on behalf of INOGEN, INC. (DeFilipp, Kristyn)
October 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/24/2020. (zcal)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant's #18 Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by November 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 21, 2020. (lccjn2)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by PALMETTO GBA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Joseph)
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Alexander Ward on behalf of PALMETTO GBA, LLC (Ward, Joseph)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Sherwood on behalf of INOGEN, INC. (Sherwood, Matthew)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SEEMA VERMA served on 9/29/2020 (London, Andrew)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/28/2020 (London, Andrew)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PALMETTO GBA, LLC served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020 (London, Andrew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA (Seabrook, April)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Matthew London on behalf of INOGEN, INC. (London, Andrew)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Ben Blanchard, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that John Ben Blanchard is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice.Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 24, 2020. (lccjn2)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matt W. Sherwood, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Matt W. Sherwood is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 24, 2020. (lccjn2)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Haider Andazola, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Haider Andazola is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 24, 2020. (lccjn2)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristyn DeFilipp, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Kristyn DeFilipp is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 24, 2020. (lccjn2)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew London, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Andrew London is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 24, 2020. (lccjn2)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 24, 2020. (lccjn2)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, PALMETTO GBA, LLC, SEEMA VERMA. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
September 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 ERRATA Original Complaint by INOGEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Alex M. Azar II, #9 Summons Seema Verma, #10 Summons Palmetto GBA LLC)(Barker, Thomas)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John Ben Blanchard, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7622666 Fee Status: Fee Paid by INOGEN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Ben Blanchard, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barker, Thomas) Modified on 9/22/2020 to add in payment information.(ztnr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matt W. Sherwood, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7622356. Fee Status: Fee Paid by INOGEN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matt W. Sherwood, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barker, Thomas) Modified on 9/22/2020 to add in payment information.(ztnr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Haider Andazola, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7622321. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INOGEN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Haider Andazola, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barker, Thomas)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kristyn DeFilipp, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7622286. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INOGEN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristyn DeFilipp, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barker, Thomas)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew London, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by INOGEN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew London, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barker, Thomas) Modified to add payment info. on 9/22/2020 (ztd). (Filing Fee: $100.00, receipt number ADCDC-7618421 on 9/21/2020.)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INOGEN, INC. (Barker, Thomas)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, PALMETTO GBA, LLC, SEEMA VERMA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7618190) filed by INOGEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Barker, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INOGEN, INC. v. AZAR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEEMA VERMA
Represented By: April Denise Seabrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALMETTO GBA, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Ward
Represented By: April Denise Seabrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: April Denise Seabrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INOGEN, INC.
Represented By: Thomas R. Barker
Represented By: Andrew Matthew London
Represented By: Matthew W. Sherwood
Represented By: Kristyn DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?