RUDOMETKIN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAMES E. MCPHERSON, CHARLES N. PEDE and RYAN MCCARTHY
Case Number: 1:2020cv02687
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN, U.S. DISCIPLINARY BARRACKS, 1300 N. Warehouse Road, Fort Leavenworth, KS 66027 (See order for further details).Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/26/2020. (DJS) (ztb).
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (2) Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service. (zsb)
September 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that CHARLES N. PEDE (Lieutenant General, in his capacity as the U.S. Army Judge Advocate General), RYAN MCCARTHY (in his capacity as the Secretary of the Army) and JAMES E. MCPHERSON (in his capacity as General Counsel to the Secretary of the Department of the Army) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as party defendants. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2020. (zsb) (zsb).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $15.00 from Prison Account of DAVID RUDOMETKIN and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2020. (zsb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN. (zmd)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN (zmd)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RYAN MCCARTHY, JAMES E. MCPHERSON, CHARLES N. PEDE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (zmd)
September 15, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/15/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUDOMETKIN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES E. MCPHERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES N. PEDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?