MARINOS et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: MARINOS MARINOS, NICOLE M. ARNONE, MARCUS E. ADAM, ALL PLAINTIFFS, MATTHEW N. ALLEN-GARCIA, WILFREDO AMAYA, SHERMAN O. ANDERSON, ROBERTO ADAMS, GREGORY H. ALEMIAN, JOSE L. ALPIZAR, MARION M. ANDERSON, JOSHUA ARANA-JIMENEZ, DWONN L. ANDERSON, JULIAN ANDERSON, JOSHUA V. ALLEN, TABITHA ALBERTI, LINDA R. ALLEN, BLAKE G. ACKERMAN, WILLIAM O. ALUA, ALI S. ALGABYALI, MUSTAFA AK, NICOLE S. ALLEN, VINCENT L. ALTIERE, MARIO A. AMADOR, RYAN M. ANSELMO, OWAIS AKHTAR, TAJUANA N. ALLEN, MARINOS M. MARINOS, FREEDOM R. ALEXANDER, JOHN N. ADJETEY, MARWAN N. ABOUZIED, ROBERT D. ANDERSON, ROBERT A. AKUOKO, ABDULKADIR M. ABDI, JOSHUA B. ANDERSON, GREGORY H. ARCHER, DANA L. ARMSTRONG, ROBERTO J. AMENGUAL, ESTEBAN ALVAREZ, MICHELLE ARROYA, LENNOX R. ANTOINE, ANTHONY M. ALLEN, BRIAN C. ADAMS, TONI-ANN ANNUNZIATA, STEPHEN P. AMODEO, MARCUS L. ADAMS DELANCEY, RODNEY R. ANDERSON, WENDY V. ALEGRIA, BRYAN N. ANDERSON, CHARLES F. ANDERSON and ZACHARY P. ALCORN
Defendant: METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2020cv02828
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MARINOS MARINOS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Sue by MARINOS MARINOS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Sue)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants; Set/Reset Deadlines:Answer due by 12/10/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/04/2020. (lcrcl2) Modified on 11/4/2020 (lsj).
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MARINOS MARINOS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobiecki, Richard)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion for leave to file address information under seal. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/03/2020. (lcrcl2)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION Leave to File Address Information Under Seal by MARINOS MARINOS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Sobiecki on behalf of All Defendants (Sobiecki, Richard)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT served on 10/23/2020 (McGillivary, Gregory)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 10/20/2020. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 11/10/2020. (McGillivary, Gregory) Modified on 10/23/2020 to correct serve/answer due date(s) (zjf).
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on the Mayor of the District of Columbia. Date of Service Upon the Mayor for the District of Columbia on 10/20/20. (McGillivary, Gregory)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M. Block on behalf of MARINOS MARINOS (Block, Sarah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
October 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7675593) filed by MARINOS MARINOS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff List, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1 - Consents to Sue, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2 - Consents to Sue, #4 Exhibit B, Part 3 - Consents to Sue, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons to Attorney General Karl Racine, #7 Summons to Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser, #8 Summons to Metropolitan Police Department)(McGillivary, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARINOS et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARINOS MARINOS
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE M. ARNONE
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS E. ADAM
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW N. ALLEN-GARCIA
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILFREDO AMAYA
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERMAN O. ANDERSON
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTO ADAMS
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY H. ALEMIAN
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE L. ALPIZAR
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION M. ANDERSON
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA ARANA-JIMENEZ
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWONN L. ANDERSON
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIAN ANDERSON
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA V. ALLEN
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TABITHA ALBERTI
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA R. ALLEN
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAKE G. ACKERMAN
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM O. ALUA
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALI S. ALGABYALI
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUSTAFA AK
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE S. ALLEN
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT L. ALTIERE
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIO A. AMADOR
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN M. ANSELMO
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWAIS AKHTAR
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAJUANA N. ALLEN
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARINOS M. MARINOS
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREEDOM R. ALEXANDER
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN N. ADJETEY
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARWAN N. ABOUZIED
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT D. ANDERSON
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. AKUOKO
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABDULKADIR M. ABDI
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA B. ANDERSON
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY H. ARCHER
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA L. ARMSTRONG
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTO J. AMENGUAL
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTEBAN ALVAREZ
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE ARROYA
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENNOX R. ANTOINE
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY M. ALLEN
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN C. ADAMS
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONI-ANN ANNUNZIATA
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN P. AMODEO
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS L. ADAMS DELANCEY
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY R. ANDERSON
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDY V. ALEGRIA
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN N. ANDERSON
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES F. ANDERSON
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY P. ALCORN
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?