TURNER et al v. U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA et al
Plaintiff: MARIE LENNON, GRANT TURNER, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, MATTHEW WALSH and KELU CHAO
Defendant: MORVARED NAMDARKHAN, U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, MICHAEL PACK, FRANK WUCO, EMILY NEWMAN, MORA NAMDAR, DIANE CULLO and SAMUEL E. DEWEY
Amicus Curiae: ELIOT ENGEL and REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Case Number: 1:2020cv02885
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding plaintiffs' #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 20, 2020. (lcbah3)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART plaintiffs' #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 20, 2020. (lcbah3)
November 12, 2020 Filing 43 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KELU CHAO, MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Kelu Chao, #2 Exhibit A to Chao Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore)
November 10, 2020 Filing 42 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DIANE CULLO, SAMUEL E. DEWEY, MORVARED NAMDARKHAN, EMILY NEWMAN, MICHAEL PACK, U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, FRANK WUCO. (Knapp, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Craig on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL (Craig, Matthew)
November 9, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Hecker on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL (Hecker, Sean)
November 7, 2020 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell, held on 11-05-2020. Page Numbers: 1 - 85. Date of Issuance: 11-07-2020. Court Reporter: Elizabeth SaintLoth; Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/28/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2021.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell: Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2020 re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, GRANT TURNER, HOANG OANH TRAN, MATTHEW WALSH. Supplementary briefing by the government due by 5:00 PM on November 10, 2020; plaintiffs' response to the government's supplementary briefing due by 5:00 PM on November 12, 2020. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Saint-Loth.) (ztg)
November 4, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF JOINDER OF PLAINTIFF KELU CHAO IN PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by KELU CHAO, MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Boutrous, Theodore)
November 4, 2020 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DIANE CULLO, SAMUEL E. DEWEY, MORVARED NAMDARKHAN, EMILY NEWMAN, MICHAEL PACK, U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, FRANK WUCO with Jury Demand filed by SHAWN POWERS, MARIE LENNON, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH, HOANG OANH TRAN, KELU CHAO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redline version of the Amended Complaint)(Boutrous, Theodore)
November 4, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Zainab Naeem Ahmad on behalf of MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Ahmad, Zainab)
November 3, 2020 Filing 38 AMICUS BRIEF by ELIOT ENGEL. (zrdj)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING proposed amicus curiae's #34 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Congressman Eliot Engel as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to docket the Brief of Congressman Eliot Engel as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 34-1. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 3, 2020. (lcbah3)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING proposed amicus curiae's #33 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Craig may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing proposed amicus curiae in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 3, 2020. (lcbah 3)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) proposed amicus curiae's #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Hecker may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing proposed amicus curiae in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 3, 2020. (lcbah3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Congressman Eliot Engel as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Eliot Engel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Joshua)
November 3, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew J. Craig, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7793862. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Eliot Engel (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Joshua)
November 3, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sean Hecker, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7793789. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Eliot Engel (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Joshua)
November 3, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Adam Matz on behalf of Eliot Engel (Matz, Joshua)
November 2, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee Crain, #2 Exhibit 1 of Crain Declaration - Background, #3 Exhibit 2 of Crain Declaration - Statement, #4 Exhibit 3 of Crain Declaration - Statement, #5 Exhibit 4 of Crain Declaration - Statement, #6 Exhibit 5 of Crain Declaration - Statement, #7 Exhibit 6 of Crain Declaration - Article, #8 Declaration of Nicholas J. Cull, #9 Exhibit A of Cull Declaration - Resume, #10 Declaration of Grant Turner, #11 Declaration of Shawn Powers)(Boutrous, Theodore)
October 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply in support of #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 2:00 PM on 11/2/2020. (ztg)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs' #29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and MODIFYING the Scheduling Order previously issued in this case, see Min. Order (Oct. 16, 2020), as follows: by 2:00 PM on November 2, 2020, plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 28, 2020. (lcbah3)
October 28, 2020 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore)
October 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Lynch on behalf of All Defendants (Lynch, Christopher)
October 26, 2020 Filing 27 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DIANE CULLO, SAMUEL E. DEWEY, MORVARED NAMDARKHAN, EMILY NEWMAN, MICHAEL PACK, U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, FRANK WUCO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Knapp, #2 Exhibit 1 to Knapp Decl. (USAGM Final Rule), #3 Declaration of Michael Pack, #4 Exhibit 1 to Pack Decl. (2016 VOA Report), #5 Exhibit 2 to Pack Decl. (Aug 5, 2020 STA Transcript), #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Knapp, Michael)
October 23, 2020 Filing 26 AMICUS BRIEF by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (zrdj)
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce D. Brown on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Brown, Bruce)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING proposed amici curiae's #22 Consent Motion for Leave to File Brief of the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 16 Media Organizations as Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to docket the Brief of the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 16 Media Organizations as Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 22-1. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 23, 2020. (lcbah3)
October 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by KatieLynn Boyd Townsend on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Townsend, KatieLynn)
October 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Rottman on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Rottman, Gabriel)
October 22, 2020 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amici Curiae)(Rottman, Gabriel)
October 21, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Crain, Lee)
October 21, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Crain, Lee)
October 21, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/16/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/15/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SAMUEL E. DEWEY served on 10/15/2020; MORVARED NAMDARKHAN served on 10/15/2020; EMILY NEWMAN served on 10/15/2020; MICHAEL PACK served on 10/15/2020; U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA served on 10/15/2020; FRANK WUCO served on 10/15/2020 (Crain, Lee)
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Kole on behalf of MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Kole, Lauren)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Grossbaum on behalf of MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Grossbaum, Alexandra)
October 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 10/26/2020; plaintiffs' reply due by 10/30/2020; Motion Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2020, at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (ztg)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of the parties' #16 Joint Notice in Response to Court's Minute Order Dated October 14, 2020, (1) ISSUING the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (a) by October 26, 2020, defendants shall file their opposition to plaintiffs' #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and (b) by October 30, 2020, plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and (2) DIRECTING the parties to appear at 10:00 AM on November 5, 2020 for a hearing before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell via videoconference. Videoconference connection details will be provided to counsel by the deputy clerk. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 16, 2020. (lcbah3)
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE \ JOINT NOTICE IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S MINUTE ORDER DATED OCTOBER 14, 2020 by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH re Order, (Boutrous, Theodore)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Fraser Knapp on behalf of All Defendants (Knapp, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mylan L. Denerstein on behalf of MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Denerstein, Mylan)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Ahmad may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiffs in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 15, 2020. (lcbah3)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Zainab N. Ahmad, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7717314. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Zainab N. Ahmad, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Lee)
October 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint response to Order of the Court due by 10:00 AM on 10/16/2020. (ztg)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Grossbaum may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiffs in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 14, 2020. (lcbah3)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Kole may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiffs in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 14, 2020. (lcbah3)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Denerstein may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiffs in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 14, 2020. (lcbah3)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs' #6 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Complaint Using Counsel's Address in Violation of Local Civil Rule 5.1(e). It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' complaint is accepted and deemed filed, and plaintiffs may proceed using their counsel's address in all submissions connected to this action until such time as this Court orders, or the parties stipulate, otherwise. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 14, 2020. (lcbah3)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to confer and jointly submit to the Court, by 10:00 AM on October 16, 2020, a proposed schedule for briefing and a hearing on plaintiffs' #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 14, 2020. (lcbah3)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Lee R. Crain, #3 Exhibit 1 to Crain Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Crain Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Crain Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Crain Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Crain Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Crain Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Crain Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Crain Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Crain Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Crain Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Crain Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 to Crain Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 to Crain Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 to Crain Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15 to Crain Declaration, #18 Exhibit 16 to Crain Declaration, #19 Exhibit 17 to Crain Declaration, #20 Exhibit 18 to Crain Declaration, #21 Exhibit 19 to Crain Declaration, #22 Exhibit 20 to Crain Declaration, #23 Exhibit 21 to Crain Declaration, #24 Exhibit 22 to Crain Declaration, #25 Exhibit 23 to Crain Declaration, #26 Exhibit 24 to Crain Declaration, #27 Exhibit 25 to Crain Declaration, #28 Exhibit 26 to Crain Declaration, #29 Exhibit 27 to Crain Declaration, #30 Exhibit 28 to Crain Declaration, #31 Exhibit 29 to Crain Declaration, #32 Exhibit 30 to Crain Declaration, #33 Exhibit 31 to Crain Declaration, #34 Exhibit 32 to Crain Declaration, #35 Exhibit 33 to Crain Declaration, #36 Exhibit 34 to Crain Declaration, #37 Exhibit 35 to Crain Declaration, #38 Exhibit 36 to Crain Declaration, #39 Exhibit 37 to Crain Declaration, #40 Exhibit 38 to Crain Declaration, #41 Exhibit 39 to Crain Declaration, #42 Exhibit 40 to Crain Declaration, #43 Exhibit 41 to Crain Declaration, #44 Exhibit 42 to Crain Declaration, #45 Exhibit 43 to Crain Declaration, #46 Exhibit 44 to Crain Declaration, #47 Exhibit 45 to Crain Declaration, #48 Exhibit 46 to Crain Declaration, #49 Exhibit 47 to Crain Declaration, #50 Exhibit 48 to Crain Declaration, #51 Exhibit 49 to Crain Declaration, #52 Exhibit 50 to Crain Declaration, #53 Exhibit 51 to Crain Declaration, #54 Exhibit 52 to Crain Declaration, #55 Exhibit 53 to Crain Declaration, #56 Exhibit 54 to Crain Declaration, #57 Exhibit 55 to Crain Declaration, #58 Exhibit 56 to Crain Declaration, #59 Exhibit 57 to Crain Declaration, #60 Declaration of Amanda Bennett, #61 Declaration of Grant Turner, #62 Declaration of John Coe, #63 Declaration of John Doe, #64 Declaration of John Roe, #65 Declaration of Kathleen Carroll, #66 Declaration of Marie Lennon, #67 Declaration of Matthew Walsh, #68 Declaration of Oanh Tran, #69 Declaration of Sandy Sugawara, #70 Declaration of Shawn Powers, #71 Declaration of Steve Capus, #72 Text of Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 10, 2020. (lcbah2)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to DIANE CULLO, SAMUEL E. DEWEY, MORVARED NAMDARKHAN, EMILY NEWMAN, MICHAEL PACK, U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, FRANK WUCO. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alexandra L. Grossbaum, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7693117. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Alexandra L. Grossbaum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Lee)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren M. Kole, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7693035. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Lauren M. Kole, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Lee)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mylan L. Denerstein, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7693018. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Mylan L. Denerstein, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Lee)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Using Counsel's Address in Violation of LCVR 5.1(e) by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee R. Crain, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Lee)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-1710. (Boutrous, Theodore)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Lipshutz on behalf of MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Lipshutz, Joshua)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Ross Crain on behalf of MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Crain, Lee)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr on behalf of MARIE LENNON, SHAWN POWERS, HOANG OANH TRAN, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH (Boutrous, Theodore)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIANE CULLO, SAMUEL E. DEWEY, MORVARED NAMDARKHAN, EMILY NEWMAN, MICHAEL PACK, U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, FRANK WUCO with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7692377) filed by SHAWN POWERS, MARIE LENNON, GRANT TURNER, MATTHEW WALSH, HOANG OANH TRAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - U.S. Agency for Global Media, #3 Summons - Michael Pack, #4 Summons - Samuel E. Dewey, #5 Summons - Diane Cullo, #6 Summons - Emily Newman, #7 Summons - Morvared Namdarkhan a/k/a Mora Namdar, #8 Summons - Frank Wuco)(Boutrous, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURNER et al v. U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORVARED NAMDARKHAN
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Represented By: Christopher M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Represented By: Christopher M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PACK
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Represented By: Christopher M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK WUCO
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Represented By: Christopher M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY NEWMAN
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Represented By: Christopher M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORA NAMDAR
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Represented By: Christopher M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE CULLO
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Represented By: Christopher M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL E. DEWEY
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Represented By: Christopher M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIE LENNON
Represented By: Lee Ross Crain
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Zainab Naeem Ahmad
Represented By: Mylan L. Denerstein
Represented By: Alexandra Grossbaum
Represented By: Lauren Kole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRANT TURNER
Represented By: Lee Ross Crain
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Zainab Naeem Ahmad
Represented By: Mylan L. Denerstein
Represented By: Alexandra Grossbaum
Represented By: Lauren Kole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN POWERS
Represented By: Lee Ross Crain
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Zainab Naeem Ahmad
Represented By: Mylan L. Denerstein
Represented By: Alexandra Grossbaum
Represented By: Lauren Kole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOANG OANH TRAN
Represented By: Lee Ross Crain
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Zainab Naeem Ahmad
Represented By: Mylan L. Denerstein
Represented By: Alexandra Grossbaum
Represented By: Lauren Kole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW WALSH
Represented By: Lee Ross Crain
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Zainab Naeem Ahmad
Represented By: Mylan L. Denerstein
Represented By: Alexandra Grossbaum
Represented By: Lauren Kole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELU CHAO
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELIOT ENGEL
Represented By: Sean Hecker
Represented By: Matthew J. Craig
Represented By: Joshua Adam Matz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Represented By: Gabriel Rottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?