CHRISTIAN v. WALMART
Plaintiff: PATRICK CHRISTIAN
Defendant: WALMART
Case Number: 1:2020cv02952
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to WALMART, sent to Marshall Services. (adh, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #4 Plaintiff's response to the order to explain his need to use an alternative address of record, permission is granted for Plaintiff to use the listed email address in lieu of a residence address. In addition, Plaintiff's motion #2 to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The Clerk shall assign this case to a district judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/16/20.(psu1)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, )
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #3 Order, filed by PATRICK CHRISTIAN. (adh, )
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that within 30 days from the filing date of this order, Plaintiff shall file either an amended complaint listing in the caption his full residence address and telephone number or a sworn statement why he cannot do so. Plaintiffs failure to comply with this order within the time provided may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 10/22/2020. (adh, )
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PATRICK CHRISTIAN (adh, )
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WALMART filed by PATRICK CHRISTIAN. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adh, )
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/9/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHRISTIAN v. WALMART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK CHRISTIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?