S.D.M. OF AMERICA v. CENTERRA
Plaintiff: S.D.M. OF AMERICA
Defendant: CENTERRA, A CONSTELLIS COMPANY and CENTERRA
Case Number: 1:2020cv02997
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Edelman, Aaron)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Summer L. Speight on behalf of CENTERRA (Speight, Summer)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher Michael Michalik, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7917235. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTERRA (Attachments: #1 Declaration PHV Declaration - Christopher M. Michalik, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, John)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Summer Laine Speight. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/27/2020. (lccrc2)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Summer Laine Speight, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7880001. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTERRA (Attachments: #1 Declaration PHV Declaration - Summer L. Speight, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV Order)(Thomas, John)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: In light of the parties' representations at the hearing on 11/19/2020, the Court will refrain from scheduling an Initial Scheduling Conference at this time. The parties' Joint Rule 16.3 Meet & Confer Statement is due by 12/18/2020 at which time the Court will consider whether a Scheduling Conference is necessary. See full order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/20/2020. (lccrc2) Modified on 11/24/2020 (lsj).
November 19, 2020 Minute Entry for video Status Conference held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/19/2020. Forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court will hold a brief Status Conference in this matter on 11/19/2020 at 11:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/18/2020. (lccrc2)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTERRA (Thomas, John)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERRA.(Thomas, John)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERRA served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 (Edelman, Aaron)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CENTERRA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joshua Leff on behalf of S.D.M. OF AMERICA (Leff, Peter)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTERRA, A CONSTELLIS COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7729356) filed by S.D.M. OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Edelman, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.D.M. OF AMERICA v. CENTERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERRA, A CONSTELLIS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERRA
Represented By: Summer L. Speight
Represented By: John E. Thomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.D.M. OF AMERICA
Represented By: Peter Joshua Leff
Represented By: Aaron S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?