CENGIZ et al v. BIN SALMAN et al
Plaintiff: HATICE CENGIZ and DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC.
Defendant: NAIF HASSAN S. ALARIFI, ABDULAZIZ SULEIMAN AL-GUMIZI, WALEED ABDULLAH M. ALSHEHRI, TURKI MUSHARRAF M. ALSEHRI, AHMED AL-ASSIRI, KHALID ALOTAIBI, MOHAMMAD SAAD H. ALZAHRANI, SALAH MUHAMMAD A. TUBAIGY, MOHAMED ALQUARI, WALEED ABDULLAH M. ALSEHRI, NAIF HASAN ALARIFI, KHALED YAHYA AL-ZAHRANI, MAHER ABDULAZIZ M. MUTREB, ABDUALAZIZ SULEIMAN AL-GUMIZI, MOHAMMED ALZAHRANI, SAIF SAAD Q. ALQAHTANI, AHMED AL-ASIRI, MOHAMED SAAD H. ALZAHRANI, ABDULRAHMAN MOHAMED ALQUARNI, MOHAMMAD AL-OTAIBI, SALAH MUHAMMED TUBAIGY, AHMAD AL-ASIRI, KHALID AEDH G. ALTAIBI, TURKI MUSERREF ALSEHRI, MOHAMMED BIN SALMAN, AHMAD ABDULAZIZ AL-JUNABI, JOHN DOES, EKREM SULTAN, BADR LAFI M. ALOTAIBI, AHMAD MOHAMMAD ASIRI, FAHAD SHABIB A. ALBALAWI, SAUD AL-QAHTANI, TURKI MUSERREF M. ALSHEHRI, TURKI MUSHARRAF M. ALSHEHRI, SALAH MOHAMMED TUBAIGY, AHMED ABDULLAH MUZAINI, MUSTAFA MOHAMMED ALMADANI, MANSOUR OTHMAN M. ABAHUSSAIN, ABDULAZIZ MOHAMMED ALHAWSAWI and THAAR GHALEB T. ALHARBI
Case Number: 1:2020cv03009
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT (Clerk's Certificate) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Receipts)(ztd)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT (REQUEST) filed by HATICE CENGIZ, DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC.. re 7 Sealed Document, filed by HATICE CENGIZ, DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.); (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO.6 TO VIEW.)(ztd)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibits A - AA) filed by HATICE CENGIZ, DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC. re #6 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by HATICE CENGIZ, DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (See Docket Entry #6 to view documents) (ztth)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #6 plaintiffs motion for leave to file documents under seal, the factors set forth in United States v. Hubbard, 650 F.2d 293, 317-22 (D.C. Cir. 1980), and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that #6 the motion and all attachments thereto shall remain under seal until otherwise ordered by the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/16/2020. (lcjdb1)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by HATICE CENGIZ, DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA)(Harper, Keith)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (25) Issued Electronically as to MANSOUR OTHMAN M. ABAHUSSAIN, AHMED AL-ASSIRI, ABDULAZIZ SULEIMAN AL-GUMIZI, AHMAD ABDULAZIZ AL-JUNABI, MOHAMMAD AL-OTAIBI, SAUD AL-QAHTANI, KHALED YAHYA AL-ZAHRANI, NAIF HASSAN S. ALARIFI, FAHAD SHABIB A. ALBALAWI, THAAR GHALEB T. ALHARBI, ABDULAZIZ MOHAMMED ALHAWSAWI, MUSTAFA MOHAMMED ALMADANI, BADR LAFI M. ALOTAIBI, KHALID ALOTAIBI, SAIF SAAD Q. ALQAHTANI, MOHAMED ALQUARI, ABDULRAHMAN MOHAMED ALQUARNI, TURKI MUSHARRAF M. ALSEHRI, WALEED ABDULLAH M. ALSHEHRI, MOHAMMAD SAAD H. ALZAHRANI, MOHAMMED BIN SALMAN, JOHN DOES, MAHER ABDULAZIZ M. MUTREB, AHMED ABDULLAH MUZAINI, EKREM SULTAN, SALAH MUHAMMAD A. TUBAIGY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zsb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Faisal Mahmood Gill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gill, Faisal)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC. (Harper, Keith)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by HATICE CENGIZ, DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC. #1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by HATICE CENGIZ, DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Complaint)(Harper, Keith)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MANSOUR OTHMAN M. ABAHUSSAIN, AHMED AL-ASSIRI, ABDULAZIZ SULEIMAN AL-GUMIZI, AHMAD ABDULAZIZ AL-JUNABI, MOHAMMAD AL-OTAIBI, SAUD AL-QAHTANI, KHALED YAHYA AL-ZAHRANI, NAIF HASSAN S. ALARIFI, FAHAD SHABIB A. ALBALAWI, THAAR GHALEB T. ALHARBI, ABDULAZIZ MOHAMMED ALHAWSAWI, MUSTAFA MOHAMMED ALMADANI, BADR LAFI M. ALOTAIBI, KHALID ALOTAIBI, SAIF SAAD Q. ALQAHTANI, MOHAMED ALQUARI, ABDULRAHMAN MOHAMED ALQUARNI, TURKI MUSHARRAF M. ALSEHRI, WALEED ABDULLAH M. ALSHEHRI, MOHAMMAD SAAD H. ALZAHRANI, MOHAMMED BIN SALMAN, MAHER ABDULAZIZ M. MUTREB, AHMED ABDULLAH MUZAINI, EKREM SULTAN, SALAH MUHAMMAD A. TUBAIGY, JOHN DOES with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7732350) filed by DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC., HATICE CENGIZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Abahussain, #4 Summons - Alarifi, #5 Summons - Al-Assiri, #6 Summons - Albalawi, #7 Summons - Al-Gumizi, #8 Summons - Alharbi, #9 Summons - Alhawsawi, #10 Summons - al-Junabi, #11 Summons - Almadani, #12 Summons - Alotaibi, #13 Summons - Al-Otaibi, #14 Summons - Alqahtani, #15 Summons - Al-Qahtani, #16 Summons - Alquari, #17 Summons - Alquarni, #18 Summons - Alsehri, #19 Summons - Alshehri, #20 Summons - Alzahrani, #21 Summons - Al-Zahrani, #22 Summons - Bin Salman, #23 Summons - Khalid Alotaibi, #24 Summons - Mutreb, #25 Summons - Muzaini, #26 Summons - Sultan, #27 Summons - Tubaigy)(Harper, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENGIZ et al v. BIN SALMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAIF HASSAN S. ALARIFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDULAZIZ SULEIMAN AL-GUMIZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALEED ABDULLAH M. ALSHEHRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURKI MUSHARRAF M. ALSEHRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMED AL-ASSIRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHALID ALOTAIBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMMAD SAAD H. ALZAHRANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALAH MUHAMMAD A. TUBAIGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMED ALQUARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALEED ABDULLAH M. ALSEHRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAIF HASAN ALARIFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHALED YAHYA AL-ZAHRANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAHER ABDULAZIZ M. MUTREB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDUALAZIZ SULEIMAN AL-GUMIZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMMED ALZAHRANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAIF SAAD Q. ALQAHTANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMED AL-ASIRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMED SAAD H. ALZAHRANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDULRAHMAN MOHAMED ALQUARNI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMMAD AL-OTAIBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALAH MUHAMMED TUBAIGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMAD AL-ASIRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHALID AEDH G. ALTAIBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURKI MUSERREF ALSEHRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMMED BIN SALMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMAD ABDULAZIZ AL-JUNABI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EKREM SULTAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BADR LAFI M. ALOTAIBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMAD MOHAMMAD ASIRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAHAD SHABIB A. ALBALAWI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAUD AL-QAHTANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURKI MUSERREF M. ALSHEHRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURKI MUSHARRAF M. ALSHEHRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALAH MOHAMMED TUBAIGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMED ABDULLAH MUZAINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSTAFA MOHAMMED ALMADANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANSOUR OTHMAN M. ABAHUSSAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDULAZIZ MOHAMMED ALHAWSAWI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THAAR GHALEB T. ALHARBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HATICE CENGIZ
Represented By: Keith M. Harper
Represented By: Faisal Mahmood Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FOR THE ARAB WORLD NOW, INC.
Represented By: Keith M. Harper
Represented By: Faisal Mahmood Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?