FREYBERG v. DCO 2400 14TH STREET, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JOEL FREYBERG
Defendant: UDR, INC. and DCO 2400 14TH STREET, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03156
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/22/2020. (znbn)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Given the filing of Plaintiff's #9 Amended Complaint, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendants' #8 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as moot; and 2) Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint by December 22, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/8/2020. (lcjeb1)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by JOEL FREYBERG.(Oster, Steven)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) by DCO 2400 14TH STREET, LLC, UDR, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stolarz, Brian)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UDR, INC. (Stolarz, Brian)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by DCO 2400 14TH STREET, LLC re Order, (Stolarz, Brian)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian W. Stolarz on behalf of All Defendants (Stolarz, Brian)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian W. Stolarz on behalf of All Defendants (Stolarz, Brian)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DCO 2400 14TH STREET, LLC served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020; UDR, INC. served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020 (Oster, Steven)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: To ensure that diversity jurisdiction exists here, the Court ORDERS that, at the time it responds to the Complaint, Defendant DCO shall submit a Notice listing all members of its LLC and their states of citizenship. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/2/2020. (lcjeb1)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DCO 2400 14TH STREET, LLC, UDR, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DCO 2400 14TH STREET, LLC, UDR, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7781269) filed by JOEL FREYBERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Oster, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREYBERG v. DCO 2400 14TH STREET, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL FREYBERG
Represented By: Steven Michael Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDR, INC.
Represented By: Brian W. Stolarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO 2400 14TH STREET, LLC
Represented By: Brian W. Stolarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?