THEODORE v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MARY J. THEODORE
Defendant: RASIER-CA LLC, NIMA SABBAGHIAN, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER-DC, LLC, DOES 1-30 and RASIER, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03211
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting Defendant Raiser-CA, LLC's #17 Motion to Dismiss Counts 2 and 4 and Plaintiff's Request for Punitive Damages. See attached Order for details. On or before January 29, 2021, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint or file a notice declining to do so. If Plaintiff files an Amended Complaint, Defendants shall respond on or before February 19, 2021. The Initial Scheduling Conference set for January 15, 2021, is hereby vacated. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/28/2020. (lctnm1)
December 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint or notice due by 1/29/2021. Defendants' response due by 2/19/2021. (hmc)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for January 15, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The conference will take place by telephone. Dial-in information will be emailed to counsel. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/17/2020(lctnm1)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Upon consideration of the #21 Notice filed on December 11, 2020, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Nima Sabbaghian for punitive damages are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. See attached order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/17/2020. (lctnm1)
December 17, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
December 16, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 & 4 Of Plaintiffs Complaint, And Plaintiffs Claim For Punitive Damages filed by RASIER-CA LLC. (Grace, Kathryn)
December 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE Consent Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claims as to Defendant Sabbaghian Only by NIMA SABBAGHIAN (Kobrin, Diana)
December 11, 2020 Filing 20 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RASIER-CA LLC (Grace, Kathryn)
December 9, 2020 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 & 4 Of Plaintiffs Complaint, And Plaintiffs Claim For Punitive Damages filed by MARY J. THEODORE. (Lee, Y.) Modified docket event/text on 12/9/2020 (eg).
December 1, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by RASIER-CA LLC.(Grace, Kathryn)
December 1, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 & 4 Of Plaintiffs Complaint, And Plaintiffs Claim For Punitive Damages by RASIER-CA LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Grace, Kathryn)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Anne Grace on behalf of RASIER, LLC, RASIER-CA LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Grace, Kathryn)
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RASIER-DC, LLC (Grace, Kathryn)
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RASIER, LLC (Grace, Kathryn)
November 24, 2020 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Grace, Kathryn)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Kobrin on behalf of NIMA SABBAGHIAN (Kobrin, Diana)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by MARY J. THEODORE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Y.)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE OF SUMMONS by MARY J. THEODORE (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lee, Y.)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Y. Kris Lee on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lee, Y.)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Diana Kobrin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7832335. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NIMA SABBAGHIAN (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by NIMA SABBAGHIAN.(Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Punitive Damages by NIMA SABBAGHIAN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Diana Kobrin is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click here for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/13/2020. (lctnm1)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer H Fitzgerald on behalf of NIMA SABBAGHIAN (Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/9/2020. (lctnm1)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #2 Errata, #1 Notice of Removal,,, (adh, )
November 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA Notice of Removal by NIMA SABBAGHIAN #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by NIMA SABBAGHIAN. (Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 004056 V Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7806195 filed by NIMA SABBAGHIAN. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents Complaint, #2 Superior Court Documents Affidavit of Service-Sabbaghian, #3 Superior Court Documents Affidavit of Service-Uber&Rasier, #4 Superior Court Documents Notice of Service of Discovery, #5 Superior Court Documents Notice of Service of Discovery, #6 Superior Court Documents Motion to Dismiss, #7 Superior Court Documents Answer to Complaint-Uber, #8 Superior Court Documents Answer to Complaint-Rasier, #9 Superior Court Documents Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #10 Superior Court Documents Notice of Removal to USDC)(Fitzgerald, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THEODORE v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER-CA LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIMA SABBAGHIAN
Represented By: Jennifer H Fitzgerald
Represented By: Diana Kobrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER-DC, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY J. THEODORE
Represented By: Y. Kris Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?