WHITLOCK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Plaintiff: CRAIG WHITLOCK
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Case Number: 1:2020cv03246
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 1/22/2021. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/8/2021. (jag)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/19/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/19/2020. (Topic, Matthew)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/19/2020. (Topic, Matthew)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY served on 11/19/2020 (Topic, Matthew)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 11/19/2020 (Topic, Matthew)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Carilli, Joseph)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Carilli, Joseph)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, )
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CRAIG WHITLOCK (Topic, Matthew)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7818367) filed by CRAIG WHITLOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-20, #3 Exhibit 21-30, #4 Exhibit 31-40, #5 Exhibit 41-48, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Topic, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITLOCK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Represented By: Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG WHITLOCK
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?