CLARK v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Plaintiff: GEMICKA CLARK
Defendant: TECHNOLOGIES UBER, INC and UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03313
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Marie Gibbons on behalf of UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Gibbons, Lauren)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Peter)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion for extension of time to file an answer, Dkt. #4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint on or before January 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/22/2020. (lcrdm1)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/17/2020. (lcrdm1)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to TECHNOLOGIES UBER, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Gemicka Clark against Technologies Uber, Inc with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7838182) filed by Gemicka Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons)(Simcox, Howard)
November 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARK v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEMICKA CLARK
Represented By: Howard Simcox, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECHNOLOGIES UBER, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Lauren Marie Gibbons
Represented By: Peter Meredith Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?