KIDD v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Plaintiff: CARLOS KIDD
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Case Number: 1:2020cv03343
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Receipt on 12/23/2020 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 2:20-cv-00295 sent by Northern District of Texas. (adh, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Texas, pursuant to the Court Order entered 11/30/2020. Sent to Court via Electronically. (adh, ) (adh, ).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of Texas. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 12/20/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/30/2020. (adh, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/30/2020) (adh, ).
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CARLOS KIDD (adh, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and MOTION FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTION against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS filed by CARLOS KIDD.(adh, )
November 16, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/16/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIDD v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS KIDD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?