JACKSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Mr. FRAZIER JACKSON and FRAZIER JACKSON
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv03380
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/9/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/7/2021. (Robinett, Michael)
January 13, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #4 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the event Summons Returned as to the U.S. Attorney. (zjf)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 12/9/2020. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 12/30/2020. (Robinett, Michael) Modified on 1/13/2021 (zjf).
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/18/2020. (Robinett, Michael)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Frazier Jackson against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by FRAZIER JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Robinett, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Payment for #1 Complaint,. ($400; Receipt number ADCDC-7862061). (Robinett, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. FRAZIER JACKSON
Represented By: Michael Clement Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRAZIER JACKSON
Represented By: Michael Clement Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?