AES ELECTRICAL INC. v. TEAM HENRY ENTERPRISES LLC et al
Plaintiff: AES ELECTRICAL INC. doing business as FREESTATE ELECTRICAL SERVICE COMPANY
Defendant: TEAM HENRY ENTERPRISES LLC, DEVON HENRY and AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv03400
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended) against All Defendants filed by AES ELECTRICAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Redlined Version of Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Revised Exhibit E)(Williams, Benjamin)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by AES ELECTRICAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Redlined Version of Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Revised Exhibit E)(Williams, Benjamin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AES ELECTRICAL INC. (Williams, Benjamin)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/24/2020. (lctnm2)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, DEVON HENRY, TEAM HENRY ENTERPRISES LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7870662) filed by AES ELECTRICAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Bond, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Subcontract, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Pay Applications, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Proof of Claim, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Checks, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Personal Guaranty, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons - Team Henry, #9 Summons Summons - Devon Henry, #10 Summons Summons - Aegis Security Insurance)(Williams, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AES ELECTRICAL INC. v. TEAM HENRY ENTERPRISES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEAM HENRY ENTERPRISES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVON HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AES ELECTRICAL INC. doing business as FREESTATE ELECTRICAL SERVICE COMPANY
Represented By: Benjamin L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?