YOUNIS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Plaintiff: MALAK YOUNIS
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, MICHAEL POMPEO, CHAD WOLF, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, KENNETH CUCCINELLI, U.S. CONSULATE, RIO DE JANEIRO, BRAZIL and TOM CHAPMAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv03401
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 8:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Brudy-Everett on behalf of All Defendants (Brudy-Everett, Kristin)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/11/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/1/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/2/2021.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to TOM CHAPMAN, KENNETH CUCCINELLI, MICHAEL POMPEO, U.S. CONSULATE, RIO DE JANEIRO, BRAZIL, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CHAD WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7870697) filed by MALAK YOUNIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Hacking, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNIS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL POMPEO
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH CUCCINELLI
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CONSULATE, RIO DE JANEIRO, BRAZIL
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM CHAPMAN
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALAK YOUNIS
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?