ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: ST. FRANCIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PHILLIPS EYE INSTITUTE, ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as CAMBRIDGE MEDICAL CENTER, ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as ABBOTT NORTHWESTERN HOSPITAL, MAIMONIDES MEDICAL CENTER, ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as OWATONNA HOSPITAL, ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as BUFFALO HOSPITAL, ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as UNITY HOSPITAL, ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as MERCY HOSPITAL, THE NEW YORK HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER OF QUEENS and NEW YORK HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER OF QUEENS
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03434
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/28/2020. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/23/2020 (Webster, Stephanie)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 25, 2020. (lcdlf3)
November 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM, MAIMONIDES MEDICAL CENTER, PHILLIPS EYE INSTITUTE, ST. FRANCIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, THE NEW YORK HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER OF QUEENS (Webster, Stephanie)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7877018) filed by ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. FRANCIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PHILLIPS EYE INSTITUTE, THE NEW YORK HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER OF QUEENS, MAIMONIDES MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. FRANCIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIPS EYE INSTITUTE
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as CAMBRIDGE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as ABBOTT NORTHWESTERN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAIMONIDES MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as OWATONNA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as BUFFALO HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as UNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as MERCY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE NEW YORK HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER OF QUEENS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW YORK HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER OF QUEENS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?