LAKE REGION HEALTHCARE CORPORATION v. AZAR
Plaintiff: LAKE REGION HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03452
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to LAKE REGION HEALTHCARE CORPORATION. Attorney Jeremy William Dutra terminated. (Collins, Sven)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/8/20. (Dutra, Jeremy)
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/2/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/31/2021. (Dutra, Jeremy)
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/28/2020 (Dutra, Jeremy)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7881721) filed by LAKE REGION HEALTHCARE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Dutra, Jeremy)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LAKE REGION HEALTHCARE CORPORATION (Dutra, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAKE REGION HEALTHCARE CORPORATION v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKE REGION HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeremy William Dutra
Represented By: Callan James Smith
Represented By: Sven C. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?