GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, MAYO CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM-FRANCISCAN HEALTHCARE IN LACROSSE, UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, RMC ANNISTON, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, HILLSDALE HOSPITAL and WEIRTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03453
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 12/7/2020. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Card, #2 Exhibit 2 - USPS Tracking)(Howk, Andrew)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/07/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Card, #2 Exhibit 2 - USPS Tracking)(Howk, Andrew)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Card, #2 Exhibit 2 - USPS Tracking)(Howk, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren N. Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rodriguez, Lauren)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by N. Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, N.)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, HILLSDALE HOSPITAL, MAYO CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM-FRANCISCAN HEALTHCARE IN LACROSSE, MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE, MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, RMC ANNISTON, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, WEIRTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Howk, Andrew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Howk on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Howk, Andrew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7881954) filed by MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HILLSDALE HOSPITAL, RMC ANNISTON, UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, MAYO CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM-FRANCISCAN HEALTHCARE IN LACROSSE, WEIRTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-CMS Ruling 1739-R, #2 Exhibit B-Hospital Providers in the federal Medicare program under the Medicare Act, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to Alex Azar, II, #5 Summons to Michael Sherwin, #6 Summons to William Barr)(Howk, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYO CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM-FRANCISCAN HEALTHCARE IN LACROSSE
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMC ANNISTON
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILLSDALE HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEIRTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?