FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER CAMPUS et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER CAMPUS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS and FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAYFAYETTE EAST
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03497
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sherwin Proof of Service)(Howk, Andrew)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Barr Proof of Service)(Howk, Andrew)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Azar Proof of Service)(Howk, Andrew)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by N. Kent Smith on behalf of FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER CAMPUS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAYFAYETTE EAST (Smith, N.)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren N. Rodriguez on behalf of FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER CAMPUS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAYFAYETTE EAST (Rodriguez, Lauren)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER CAMPUS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAYFAYETTE EAST (Howk, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER CAMPUS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAYFAYETTE EAST. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-139. (Howk, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Howk on behalf of FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER CAMPUS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAYFAYETTE EAST (Howk, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7901309) filed by FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER CAMPUS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAYFAYETTE EAST. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex Azar, II, #3 Summons to Michael Sherwin, #4 Summons to William Barr)(Howk, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER CAMPUS et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER CAMPUS
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAYFAYETTE EAST
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?