MISSOURI DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: MISSOURI DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03611
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/13/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/14/2021. (Smith, Rebecca)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/21/20. (Smith, Rebecca)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 12/21/2020 (Smith, Rebecca)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/21/2020 (Smith, Rebecca)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Erin Tondow Smith on behalf of MISSOURI DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES (Smith, Rebecca) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/16/2020) (znmw).
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7947258) filed by MISSOURI DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons - HHS, #4 Summons Summons - Azar, #5 Summons Summons - Barr, #6 Summons Summons - Sherwin)(Brown, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MISSOURI DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSOURI DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES
Represented By: Caroline Montrose Brown
Represented By: Rebecca Erin Tondow Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?