DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: THE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as DUKE RALEIGH HOSPITAL, GEISINGER WYOMING VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as DURHAM REGIONAL HOSPITAL and WASHINGTON HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03765
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' response due by 2/19/2021. (hmc)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendant's #9 Notice of Related Case and #10 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Deadline to Respond to the Complaint, it is hereby ordered that the Defendant's #10 Motion is granted. The deadline for the Defendant to respond to the complaint is vacated and this case shall be stayed pending further action on the Defendant's #9 Notice of Related Case. It is further ordered that the Plaintiffs shall respond to the Defendant's #9 Notice on or before February 19, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/12/2021. (lctnm2)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, MOTION to Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-190. (Orloff, Serena)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Orloff, Serena)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/22/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/20/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/28/2020. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/28/2020 (Webster, Stephanie)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/22/2020. (lctnm2)
December 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER WYOMING VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, THE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL (Webster, Stephanie)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7983455) filed by GEISINGER WYOMING VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., THE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL, GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as DUKE RALEIGH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEISINGER WYOMING VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as DURHAM REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?