ANMED HEALTH v. AZAR
Plaintiff: ANMED HEALTH
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03826
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/21/2021. (Williams, Barbara)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/21/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/22/2021. (Williams, Barbara)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/5/2021. (lcrdm2)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANMED HEALTH (Williams, Barbara)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AnMed Health against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8009204) filed by ANMED HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Williams, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANMED HEALTH v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANMED HEALTH
Represented By: Barbara Straub Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?