WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY FORT WORTH formerly known as PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY DALLAS, COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTERS, EASTERN IDAHO HEALTH SERVICES, INC. doing business as EASTERN IDAHO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC. doing business as JOHN RANDOLPH MEDICAL CENTER, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER BAYONET POINT, COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P. doing business as RIO GRANDE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD. doing business as LAS PALMAS MEDICAL CENTER, BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD. doing business as CORPUS CHRISTI MEDICAL CENTER, BAY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER, GREENVIEW HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as GREENVIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY DENTON formerly doing business as DENTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as FRANKFORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC doing business as CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER formerly doing business as INDEPENDENCE REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL, CHCA CONROE, L.P. doing business as HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE CONROE, COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as OGDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as ST. PETERSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as COLUMBIA HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY MCKINNEY, CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P. doing business as HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE WEST, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD doing business as WESTSIDE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY LEWISVILLE, GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P. doing business as VALLEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, GPCH-GP, INC. doing business as GARDEN PARK MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as ST. PATRICK HOSPITAL, CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P. doing business as HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE CLEAR LAKE, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY PLANO, CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, GALENCARE, INC. doing business as BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL, CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P. doing business as HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE SOUTHEAST, PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC. doing business as MEDICAL CITY LAS COLINAS, DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL (AUGUSTA), CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as ST. FRANCES CABRINI HOSPITAL, CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as HORIZON MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as SCHUMPERT MEDICAL CENTER, FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as WEST FLORIDA HOSPITAL, FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as FAIRVIEW PARK HOSPITAL, CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as CHRISTUS SPOHN HOSPITAL CORPUS CHRISTI, CHRISTUS HEALTH formerly doing business as ST. JOHN HOSPITAL, GALENCARE, INC. doing business as NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL, EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC doing business as EMORY EASTSIDE MEDICAL CENTER, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as ST. LUCIE MEDICAL CENTER, CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as CJW MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as CHRISTUS HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY ARLINGTON and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II and NORRIS COCHRAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2021. (znbn)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a joint status report by March 18, 2021, addressing the parties' positions on case relatedness in light of the March 11, 2021, status conference in No. 19-mc-190. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/1/2021. (lcjeb1)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #8 Notice of Related Case filed by BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., BAY HOSPITAL, INC., CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC, CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P., CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P., CHCA CONROE, L.P., CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P., CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC., CHRISTUS HEALTH, COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P., COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC., DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC, EASTERN IDAHO HEALTH SERVICES, INC., EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC, EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC., EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD., FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., GALENCARE, INC., GPCH-GP, INC., GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GREENVIEW HOSPITAL, INC., HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Webster, Stephanie)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NORRIS COCHRAN filed by CHRISTUS HEALTH, GALENCARE, INC., COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC., HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD., COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P., DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC, CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P., FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., EASTERN IDAHO HEALTH SERVICES, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CHCA CONROE, L.P., COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P., CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P., EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., GPCH-GP, INC., CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC., CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GREENVIEW HOSPITAL, INC., COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P., FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC., EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC, BAY HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Webster, Stephanie)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-190. (Orloff, Serena)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Orloff, Serena)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/25/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/1/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 1/28/2021 (Webster, Stephanie)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., BAY HOSPITAL, INC., CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC, CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P., CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P., CHCA CONROE, L.P., CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P., CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC., CHRISTUS HEALTH, COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P., COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC., DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC, EASTERN IDAHO HEALTH SERVICES, INC., EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC, EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC., EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD., FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., GALENCARE, INC., GPCH-GP, INC., GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GREENVIEW HOSPITAL, INC., HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8032433) filed by CHRISTUS HEALTH, GALENCARE, INC., COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC., HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD., COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P., DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC, CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P., FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., EASTERN IDAHO HEALTH SERVICES, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CHCA CONROE, L.P., COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P., CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P., EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., GPCH-GP, INC., CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC., CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GREENVIEW HOSPITAL, INC., COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P., FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC., EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC, BAY HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY FORT WORTH formerly known as PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY DALLAS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTERS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EASTERN IDAHO HEALTH SERVICES, INC. doing business as EASTERN IDAHO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC. doing business as JOHN RANDOLPH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER BAYONET POINT
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P. doing business as RIO GRANDE REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD. doing business as LAS PALMAS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD. doing business as CORPUS CHRISTI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREENVIEW HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as GREENVIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY DENTON formerly doing business as DENTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as FRANKFORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC doing business as CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER formerly doing business as INDEPENDENCE REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA CONROE, L.P. doing business as HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE CONROE
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as OGDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as ST. PETERSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as COLUMBIA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY MCKINNEY
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P. doing business as HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE WEST
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD doing business as WESTSIDE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY LEWISVILLE
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P. doing business as VALLEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GPCH-GP, INC. doing business as GARDEN PARK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as ST. PATRICK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P. doing business as HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE CLEAR LAKE
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY PLANO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALENCARE, INC. doing business as BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P. doing business as HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE SOUTHEAST
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC. doing business as MEDICAL CITY LAS COLINAS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL (AUGUSTA)
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as ST. FRANCES CABRINI HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as HORIZON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as SCHUMPERT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as WEST FLORIDA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as FAIRVIEW PARK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as CHRISTUS SPOHN HOSPITAL CORPUS CHRISTI
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTUS HEALTH formerly doing business as ST. JOHN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALENCARE, INC. doing business as NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC doing business as EMORY EASTSIDE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as ST. LUCIE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as CJW MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as CHRISTUS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY ARLINGTON
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?