ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT et al v. WHEELER
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, ENVIRONMENT TEXAS, NETA RHYNE, SIERRA CLUB and PORT ARTHUR COMMUNITY ACTION NETWORK
Defendant: ANDREW R. WHEELER
Case Number: 1:2021cv00009
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/7/2021. (zcal)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant's #9 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint by May 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 26, 2021. (lccjn3)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/7/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Lam, Sylvia)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/07/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Electronic Confirmation)(Lam, Sylvia)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREW R. WHEELER served on 1/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Lam, Sylvia)
February 18, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #8 Notice (Other); emailed to slam@environmentalintegrity.org, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Please use correct Return of service executed event. (zeg, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by ANDREW R. WHEELER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Izfar, Sarah)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service by ENVIRONMENT TEXAS, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PORT ARTHUR COMMUNITY ACTION NETWORK, NETA RHYNE, SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lam, Sylvia)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 7, 2021. (lccjn3)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW R. WHEELER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SIERRA CLUB (Lam, Sylvia)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PORT ARTHUR COMMUNITY ACTION NETWORK (Lam, Sylvia)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENT TEXAS (Lam, Sylvia)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Lam, Sylvia)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW R. WHEELER in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8033104) filed by PORT ARTHUR COMMUNITY ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, ENVIRONMENT TEXAS, SIERRA CLUB, NETA RHYNE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Lam, Sylvia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT et al v. WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW R. WHEELER
Represented By: Sarah Izfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Represented By: Sylvia Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENT TEXAS
Represented By: Sylvia Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NETA RHYNE
Represented By: Sylvia Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Sylvia Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORT ARTHUR COMMUNITY ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Sylvia Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?