BAMBERGER v. UNITED NATURAL FOODS INC. et al
Plaintiff: KAELA BAMBERGER
Defendant: UNITED NATURAL FOODS INC. and TESHAWN COOPER
Case Number: 1:2021cv00018
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2021 Discovery To Conclude by 11/30/2021. Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Rule 26(a)(1) Shall Be Exchanged due by 2/26/2021. Amendments To The Pleadings due by 5/31/2021. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures due by 7/1/2021. Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures due by 09/01/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2021. (mac)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #8 Meet and Confer Statement, the Court finds that an initial scheduling conference is not necessary. The parties shall adhere to the following schedule: (1) discovery shall commence on February 12, 2021, and discovery shall conclude on November 30, 2021; (2) initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) shall be exchanged by no later than February 26, 2021; (3) any amendments to the pleadings, including joining additional parties, shall be made by no later than May 31, 2021; (4) Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be provided by no later than July 1, 2021; (5) Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be provided by no later than September 1, 2021; (6) dispositive motions shall be filed by no later than December 15, 2021. The parties shall be limited to 25 interrogatories and 10 depositions per side. Discovery shall conform with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this Court's Local Civil Rules. The Court declines to set a pre-trial conference date or a trial date at this time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/12/2021. (lcegs3)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Regan, Patrick)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNITED NATURAL FOODS INC. (Dunn, Christopher)
February 6, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Report due by 3/5/2021. (mac)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #6 Answer, the parties shall meet and confer as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Civil Rule 16.3. The parties shall file a Meet and Confer Report by no later than March 5, 2021. In addition to the proposed scheduling order as required by Local Civil Rule 16.3, counsel shall include in their report a brief statement of the case. In considering what form of alternative dispute resolution the parties think the case most suited to, counsel are reminded that among their options are mediation, arbitration, early neutral evaluation, summary jury trial, or any other form of alternative dispute resolution which can be tailored to the needs of their case. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/5/2021. (lcegs3)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by TESHAWN COOPER, UNITED NATURAL FOODS INC..(Dunn, Christopher)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TESHAWN COOPER served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Regan, Patrick)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED NATURAL FOODS INC. served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021(Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic Return Receipt)(Regan, Patrick) Modified on 1/24/2021 to correct serve/answer due date(s) (zjf).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/08/21. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to TESHAWN COOPER, UNITED NATURAL FOODS INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8042079) filed by KAELA BAMBERGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Regan, Patrick)
January 6, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAMBERGER v. UNITED NATURAL FOODS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAELA BAMBERGER
Represented By: Patrick Michael Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED NATURAL FOODS INC.
Represented By: Christopher Redmond Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TESHAWN COOPER
Represented By: Christopher Redmond Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?