AMERICAN RIVERS et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Plaintiff: HEALTHY GULF, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY, SIERRA CLUB and AMERICAN RIVERS
Defendant: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY and ANDREW WHEELER
Petitioner: BOARD OF MISSISSIPPI LEVEE COMMISSIONERS
Case Number: 1:2021cv00097
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 23 ERRATA Exhibit A to Unopposed Motion for Abeyance by ANDREW WHEELER, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY re #22 Unopposed MOTION to Hold in Abeyance filed by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, ANDREW WHEELER. (Gange, Heather)
March 12, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Hold in Abeyance by ANDREW WHEELER, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gange, Heather)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendants' #22 Unopposed Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the case will be held in abeyance until July 10, 2021. The parties shall file a joint status report proposing a schedule for future proceedings on or before August 9, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 12, 2021. (lcdlf2)
March 8, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Intervene by Board of Mississippi Levee Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Fawal, Margaret)
March 1, 2021 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/1/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Civil Process Clerk))(Gillespie, Stuart)
February 9, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (eg)
February 8, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for Civil Process Clerk filed by HEALTHY GULF, AMERICAN RIVERS, SIERRA CLUB, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY.(Gillespie, Stuart)
February 4, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/27/2021. (View Docket Entry #16 to view document) (eg) Modified docket text on 2/5/2021 (eg).
February 4, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREW WHEELER served on 1/26/2021; ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 1/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (EPA), #2 Exhibit B (A. Wheeler), #3 Exhibit C (J. Rosen), #4 Exhibit D (H. Gange))(Gillespie, Stuart)
January 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharmeen Morrison on behalf of AMERICAN RIVERS, HEALTHY GULF, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY, SIERRA CLUB (Morrison, Sharmeen)
January 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Witkowski Heaps on behalf of AMERICAN RIVERS, HEALTHY GULF, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY, SIERRA CLUB (Heaps, Jill)
January 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Campbell Gillespie on behalf of AMERICAN RIVERS, HEALTHY GULF, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY, SIERRA CLUB (Gillespie, Stuart)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Jill Witkowski Heaps. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 22, 2021. (lcdlf2)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Sharmeen Ellen Morrison. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 22, 2021. (lcdlf2)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Stuart C. Gillespie. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 22, 2021. (lcdlf2)
January 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather E. Gange on behalf of ANDREW WHEELER, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Gange, Heather)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against ANDREW WHEELER, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY filed by HEALTHY GULF, AMERICAN RIVERS, SIERRA CLUB, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint (Redline Version))(Sewell, Anna)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW WHEELER, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) Modified on 1/15/2021 (zeg).
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW WHEELER, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(eg)
January 15, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #10 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error as duplicate to Docket Entry #9 . (eg)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 13, 2021. (lcdlf2)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by HEALTHY GULF, AMERICAN RIVERS, SIERRA CLUB, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by HEALTHY GULF, AMERICAN RIVERS, SIERRA CLUB, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY. (Attachments: #1 Summons A. Wheeler, #2 Summons J. Rosen (Acting US Attorney General))(Sewell, Anna)
January 13, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #6 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to asewell@earthjustice.org, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. Please use the AO440 summons https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/CivilSummonsAO440_2015FILL.pdf, 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
January 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by HEALTHY GULF, AMERICAN RIVERS, SIERRA CLUB, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by HEALTHY GULF, AMERICAN RIVERS, SIERRA CLUB, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY. (Attachments: #1 Summons A. Wheeler, #2 Summons J. Rosen (Acting US Attorney General))(Sewell, Anna) Modified on 1/13/2021 (zsb).
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sharmeen Ellen Morrison, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8065999. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN RIVERS, HEALTHY GULF, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY, SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sewell, Anna)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jill Witkowski Heaps, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8065917. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN RIVERS, HEALTHY GULF, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY, SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sewell, Anna)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stuart C. Gillespie, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8065843. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN RIVERS, HEALTHY GULF, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY, SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sewell, Anna)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN RIVERS, HEALTHY GULF, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY, SIERRA CLUB (Sewell, Anna)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW WHEELER, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8065301) filed by HEALTHY GULF, AMERICAN RIVERS, SIERRA CLUB, NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons EPA, #3 Summons A. Wheeler, #4 Summons J. Rosen (Acting US Attorney General))(Sewell, Anna)
January 12, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to asewell@earthjustice.org, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN RIVERS et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTHY GULF
Represented By: Anna Marie Sewell
Represented By: Stuart Campbell Gillespie
Represented By: Jill Witkowski Heaps
Represented By: Sharmeen Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY
Represented By: Anna Marie Sewell
Represented By: Stuart Campbell Gillespie
Represented By: Jill Witkowski Heaps
Represented By: Sharmeen Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Anna Marie Sewell
Represented By: Stuart Campbell Gillespie
Represented By: Jill Witkowski Heaps
Represented By: Sharmeen Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN RIVERS
Represented By: Anna Marie Sewell
Represented By: Stuart Campbell Gillespie
Represented By: Jill Witkowski Heaps
Represented By: Sharmeen Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Heather E. Gange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW WHEELER
Represented By: Heather E. Gange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BOARD OF MISSISSIPPI LEVEE COMMISSIONERS
Represented By: Margaret Kuhn Fawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?