CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: HEALTHY GULF and CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE and DAVID BERNHARDT
Case Number: 1:2021cv00107
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1540
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 1/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Elise)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 1/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Elise)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/28/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Elise)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Elise)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lopez, Jaclyn) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/21/2021) (ztth).
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, HEALTHY GULF (Bennett, Elise)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 ERRATA Correcting Civil Cover Sheet by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, HEALTHY GULF re #1 Complaint, filed by HEALTHY GULF, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Corrected)(Bennett, Elise)
January 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
January 15, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to ebennett@biologicaldiversity.org, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, )
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8069927) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, HEALTHY GULF. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, #3 Summons for Secretary Bernhardt, #4 Summons for Acting Attorney General Rosen, #5 Summons for Acting U.S. Attorney Sherwin)(Bennett, Elise)
January 13, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to ebennett@biologicaldiversity.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTHY GULF
Represented By: Elise Pautler Bennett
Represented By: Jaclyn Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Elise Pautler Bennett
Represented By: Jaclyn Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?