LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY v. HALL et al
Plaintiff: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: GOS TRANS, LLC, ASTERIA CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF V N BROTHERS TRUCKING, RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF ECLECTIC LOGISTICS, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF MGS LOGISTICS INC., ALL FRIGHT CARRIERS INC., SILVER FROG FREIGHT LOGISTICS, LLC, OUTSOURCE FINANCIAL ASSIGNEE OF HUENERPRISES LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF MITOK EXPRESS INC., GUSTAVO SALAZAR LOPEZ doing business as ALACRAN TRUCKING, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF TRUELOVE FAMILY TRUCKING, INC., ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF BMM TRUCKING INC., MIDWEST ELITE CARRIERS CORP, A.V.M. TRUCKING, INC., PRO FUNDING INC. ASSIGNEE OF CHAIN HAND LOGISTICS, LLC, SILVER TRUCKING, LLC, ELITE ONE TRANSPORTATION, RTS FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSIGNEE OF RAFA TRANS INC., FELIX & SONS TRUCKING, LLC, BEHNE INC., RTS FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSIGNEE OF ALL FREIGHT CARRIERS, INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF TRANSPORT XKE REGALDO, LLC, ON MY WAY EXPRESS INC., PHOENIX CAPITAL GROUP, LLC ASSIGNEE OF JBB LOGISTICS LLC, ARELLANO TRUCKING INC., OZZY LOGISTICS, LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF AD FREIGHT INC., COLBY SKILES doing business as COLBY SKILES TRUCKING, STE EXPRESS INC., ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF CRAZY HORSE TRANSPORT LLC, TRIUMPH TRANSPORT INC., ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF AA BROTHERS TRUCKING LLC, SUNBELT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF DIAMOND STAR TRUCKING INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF KANECA INC., MCENROE LOGISTICS, INC., EXPRESS FREIGHT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF DERRICO TRUCKING, APEX CAPITAL CORP ASSIGNEE OF USA FREIGHT SERVICE, INC., TBS FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF SR TRANSPORTATION, DAM LOGISTICS INC., WARREN C. SAUERS CO., INC., ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF DSK TRANSIT LLC, RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF GT EXPRESS INC., LION TRANS INC., SWAT LOGISTICS LLC, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF ACEM TRUCKING GROUP LLC, ROBIN LOGISTICS, INC., J D FACTORS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF VEKA, INC., SEVENOAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF JEF XPRESS, WENDELL KEVIN LIN, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF BPV TRANSPORTS LLC, ECAPITAL FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF BEST CHOICE LOGISTICS, JSP TRANSPORTATION LLC, DAVIS AND JONES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF KBM ENTERPRISES, FIRST LINE FUNDING GROUP ASSIGNEE OF POWER BY LOGISTICS INC., RLMJ TRANSPORT, LLC, KOEHN CONTRACTING SERVICE, INC., DOUBLE C SERVICES LLC, QUICK PAY FUNDING ASSIGNEE OF ASL TRANSPORT AND SERVICES, LLC, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF E UNITED EXPRESS INC., BABAK KHAMOUSHIAN, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF FLIGHT LOGISTICS INC., TRK GROUP INC. doing business as TRK GROUP, WEBER TRANSPORT, LLC, SUNBELT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF MX6 TRUCKING LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JUAN P VARGAS, BAHA TRUCKING, LLC, SEVENOAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF ROBLES TRANSPORTATION, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF USA EAGLE TRUCKING, FAST WAY LLC, APEX CAPITAL CORP ASSIGNEE OF ALL N TRANSPORT, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF AFC TRANSPORT, INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF EAGLE EXPRESS, CATALYST LOGISTICS, INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF ANGULO TRANSPORTATION SERVICE LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF NUFY TRANSPORTATION LLC, LEAD DRIVER LLC, WEST MOTOR FREIGHT OF PA, MOEX LLC, GENERAL FREIGHT SYSTEM INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JADA TRANSPORTS LLC, DOUG DAVIDSON TRUCKING LLC, ANCHOR TRANSPORTATION, LLC, RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF STRATAN INC., ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF WTWM TRANSPORT, SKY TRANSPORT LLC, TAB BANK ASSIGNEE OF STEIN & SON, MARK SPILLMAN doing business as MS HAULING, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF M&G TRUCK LINES LLC, COMPASS FUNDING SOLUTIONS LLC ASSIGNEE OF MD PROGROUP INC., TRANS RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF RUN DIRECT INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF 3 BROTHERS EXPRESS INC., ASA CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION ASSIGNEE OF DNA STATE WIDE, INC., ADVANCED COMMERCIAL CAPITAL, INC. ASSIGNEE OF EL MARRO TRANSPORT, FIRST LINE FUNDING GROUP ASSIGNEE OF NAIVIX TRANSPORT INC., JUDGE FARM LLC, AMERITUR, LLC doing business as MEBA EXPRESS, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF J C SPECIALIZED LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF LPD TRANSPORTER, AMERICARS TRANSPORTATION, INC., TAYLOR E HALL, THROUGH TRUCKING LLC doing business as CARGOMASTER TRANSPORT, BRIAN E. SMITH doing business as SMITH FIRST TRUCKING and TBS FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF ADAM TRUCK LINE
Case Number: 1:2021cv00130
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE. OZZY LOGISTICS, LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 19, 2021 Filing 80 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SILVER FROG FREIGHT LOGISTICS, LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 19, 2021 Filing 79 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ON MY WAY EXPRESS INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 19, 2021 Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE. MOEX LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 19, 2021 Filing 77 WAIVER OF SERVICE. AMERITUR, LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 19, 2021 Filing 76 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ARELLANO TRUCKING INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 18, 2021 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE. DOUG DAVIDSON TRUCKING LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 17, 2021 Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SWAT LOGISTICS LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 16, 2021 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE. J D FACTORS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF VEKA, INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 16, 2021 Filing 72 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JUDGE FARM LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 12, 2021 Filing 71 WAIVER OF SERVICE. A.V.M. TRUCKING, INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 11, 2021 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE. APEX CAPITAL CORP ASSIGNEE OF ALL N TRANSPORT waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 11, 2021 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE. APEX CAPITAL CORP ASSIGNEE OF USA FREIGHT SERVICE, INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 10, 2021 Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE. LION TRANS INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 10, 2021 Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE. TBS FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF SR TRANSPORTATION waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 10, 2021 Filing 66 WAIVER OF SERVICE. TBS FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF ADAM TRUCK LINE waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 9, 2021 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SEVENOAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF JEF XPRESS waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 8, 2021 Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SEVENOAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF ROBLES TRANSPORTATION waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 8, 2021 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BABAK KHAMOUSHIAN waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 8, 2021 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE. WARREN C. SAUERS CO., INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SUNBELT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF DIAMOND STAR TRUCKING INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SKY TRANSPORT LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SUNBELT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF MX6 TRUCKING LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE. TRIUMPH TRANSPORT INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE. FIRST LINE FUNDING GROUP ASSIGNEE OF POWER BY LOGISTICS INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE. FIRST LINE FUNDING GROUP ASSIGNEE OF NAIVIX TRANSPORT INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ADVANCED COMMERCIAL CAPITAL, INC. ASSIGNEE OF EL MARRO TRANSPORT waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BRIAN E. SMITH waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ROBIN LOGISTICS, INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE. STE EXPRESS INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ASA CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION ASSIGNEE OF DNA STATE WIDE, INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE. MARK SPILLMAN waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF 3 BROTHERS EXPRESS INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF AD FREIGHT INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF AFC TRANSPORT, INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF ANGULO TRANSPORTATION SERVICE LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF BPV TRANSPORTS LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF EAGLE EXPRESS waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JADA TRANSPORTS LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JUAN P VARGAS waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF KANECA INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF LPD TRANSPORTER waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF M&G TRUCK LINES LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF MITOK EXPRESS INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF NUFY TRANSPORTATION LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF TRANSPORT XKE REGALDO, LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF TRUELOVE FAMILY TRUCKING, INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF USA EAGLE TRUCKING waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE. MCENROE LOGISTICS, INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JSP TRANSPORTATION LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE. OUTSOURCE FINANCIAL ASSIGNEE OF HUENERPRISES LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SILVER TRUCKING, LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE. TRANS RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF RUN DIRECT INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE. PRO FUNDING INC. ASSIGNEE OF CHAIN HAND LOGISTICS, LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE. WENDELL KEVIN LIN waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE. WEST MOTOR FREIGHT OF PA waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE. TAB BANK ASSIGNEE OF STEIN & SON waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE. AMERICARS TRANSPORTATION, INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF E UNITED EXPRESS INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF BMM TRUCKING INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF J C SPECIALIZED LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF WTWM TRANSPORT waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF MGS LOGISTICS INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF FLIGHT LOGISTICS INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF DSK TRANSIT LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF CRAZY HORSE TRANSPORT LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF ACEM TRUCKING GROUP LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF AA BROTHERS TRUCKING LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE. GUSTAVO SALAZAR LOPEZ waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE. FAST WAY LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE. MIDWEST ELITE CARRIERS CORP waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE. EXPRESS FREIGHT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF DERRICO TRUCKING waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ELITE ONE TRANSPORTATION waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE. DAM LOGISTICS INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE. COLBY SKILES waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BEHNE INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE. COMPASS FUNDING SOLUTIONS LLC ASSIGNEE OF MD PROGROUP INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE. GENERAL FREIGHT SYSTEM INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE. WEBER TRANSPORT, LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE. KOEHN CONTRACTING SERVICE, INC. waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Husk, John)
January 15, 2021 SUMMONS Not Issued as to A.V.M. TRUCKING, INC., ADVANCED COMMERCIAL CAPITAL, INC. ASSIGNEE OF EL MARRO TRANSPORT, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF AA BROTHERS TRUCKING LLC, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF CRAZY HORSE TRANSPORT LLC, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF DSK TRANSIT LLC, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF FLIGHT LOGISTICS INC., ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF MGS LOGISTICS INC., ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF WTWM TRANSPORT, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF ACEM TRUCKING GROUP LLC, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF BMM TRUCKING INC., ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF E UNITED EXPRESS INC., ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF J C SPECIALIZED LLC, ALL FRIGHT CARRIERS INC., AMERICARS TRANSPORTATION, INC., AMERITUR, LLC, ANCHOR TRANSPORTATION, LLC, APEX CAPITAL CORP ASSIGNEE OF ALL N TRANSPORT, APEX CAPITAL CORP ASSIGNEE OF USA FREIGHT SERVICE, INC., ARELLANO TRUCKING INC., ASA CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION ASSIGNEE OF DNA STATE WIDE, INC., ASTERIA CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF V N BROTHERS TRUCKING, BABAK KHAMOUSHIAN, BAHA TRUCKING, LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF 3 BROTHERS EXPRESS INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF AD FREIGHT INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF AFC TRANSPORT, INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF ANGULO TRANSPORTATION SERVICE LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF BPV TRANSPORTS LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF EAGLE EXPRESS, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JADA TRANSPORTS LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JUAN P VARGAS, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF KANECA INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF LPD TRANSPORTER, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF M&G TRUCK LINES LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF MITOK EXPRESS INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF NUFY TRANSPORTATION LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF TRANSPORT XKE REGALDO, LLC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF TRUELOVE FAMILY TRUCKING, INC., BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF USA EAGLE TRUCKING, BEHNE INC., BRIAN E. SMITH, CATALYST LOGISTICS, INC., COLBY SKILES, COMPASS FUNDING SOLUTIONS LLC ASSIGNEE OF MD PROGROUP INC., DAM LOGISTICS INC., DAVIS AND JONES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF KBM ENTERPRISES, DOUBLE C SERVICES LLC, DOUG DAVIDSON TRUCKING LLC, ECAPITAL FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF BEST CHOICE LOGISTICS, ELITE ONE TRANSPORTATION, EXPRESS FREIGHT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF DERRICO TRUCKING, FAST WAY LLC, FELIX & SONS TRUCKING, LLC, FIRST LINE FUNDING GROUP ASSIGNEE OF NAIVIX TRANSPORT INC., FIRST LINE FUNDING GROUP ASSIGNEE OF POWER BY LOGISTICS INC., GENERAL FREIGHT SYSTEM INC., GOS TRANS, LLC, GUSTAVO SALAZAR LOPEZ, TAYLOR E HALL, J D FACTORS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF VEKA, INC., JSP TRANSPORTATION LLC, JUDGE FARM LLC, KOEHN CONTRACTING SERVICE, INC., LEAD DRIVER LLC, LION TRANS INC., MARK SPILLMAN, MCENROE LOGISTICS, INC., MIDWEST ELITE CARRIERS CORP, MOEX LLC, ON MY WAY EXPRESS INC., OUTSOURCE FINANCIAL ASSIGNEE OF HUENERPRISES LLC, OZZY LOGISTICS, LLC, PHOENIX CAPITAL GROUP, LLC ASSIGNEE OF JBB LOGISTICS LLC, PRO FUNDING INC. ASSIGNEE OF CHAIN HAND LOGISTICS, LLC, QUICK PAY FUNDING ASSIGNEE OF ASL TRANSPORT AND SERVICES, LLC, RLMJ TRANSPORT, LLC, ROBIN LOGISTICS, INC., RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF ECLECTIC LOGISTICS, RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF GT EXPRESS INC., RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF STRATAN INC., RTS FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSIGNEE OF ALL FREIGHT CARRIERS, INC., RTS FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSIGNEE OF RAFA TRANS INC., SEVENOAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF JEF XPRESS, SEVENOAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF ROBLES TRANSPORTATION, SILVER FROG FREIGHT LOGISTICS, LLC, SILVER TRUCKING, LLC, SKY TRANSPORT LLC, STE EXPRESS INC., SUNBELT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF DIAMOND STAR TRUCKING INC., SUNBELT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF MX6 TRUCKING LLC, SWAT LOGISTICS LLC, TAB BANK ASSIGNEE OF STEIN & SON, TBS FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF ADAM TRUCK LINE, TBS FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF SR TRANSPORTATION, THROUGH TRUCKING LLC, TRANS RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF RUN DIRECT INC., TRIUMPH TRANSPORT INC., TRK GROUP INC., WARREN C. SAUERS CO., INC., WEBER TRANSPORT, LLC, WENDELL KEVIN LIN, WEST MOTOR FREIGHT OF PA (adh, )
January 15, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER, INDEMNITY AND POSTING OF COLLATERAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8083440) filed by LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-General Agreement of Indemnity, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Husk, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY v. HALL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOS TRANS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTERIA CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF V N BROTHERS TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF ECLECTIC LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF MGS LOGISTICS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL FRIGHT CARRIERS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILVER FROG FREIGHT LOGISTICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OUTSOURCE FINANCIAL ASSIGNEE OF HUENERPRISES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF MITOK EXPRESS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUSTAVO SALAZAR LOPEZ doing business as ALACRAN TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF TRUELOVE FAMILY TRUCKING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF BMM TRUCKING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST ELITE CARRIERS CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.V.M. TRUCKING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRO FUNDING INC. ASSIGNEE OF CHAIN HAND LOGISTICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILVER TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELITE ONE TRANSPORTATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSIGNEE OF RAFA TRANS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELIX & SONS TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEHNE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSIGNEE OF ALL FREIGHT CARRIERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF TRANSPORT XKE REGALDO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ON MY WAY EXPRESS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHOENIX CAPITAL GROUP, LLC ASSIGNEE OF JBB LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARELLANO TRUCKING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OZZY LOGISTICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF AD FREIGHT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLBY SKILES doing business as COLBY SKILES TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STE EXPRESS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF CRAZY HORSE TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIUMPH TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF AA BROTHERS TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNBELT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF DIAMOND STAR TRUCKING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF KANECA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCENROE LOGISTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS FREIGHT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF DERRICO TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX CAPITAL CORP ASSIGNEE OF USA FREIGHT SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF SR TRANSPORTATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAM LOGISTICS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN C. SAUERS CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF DSK TRANSIT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF GT EXPRESS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LION TRANS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWAT LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF ACEM TRUCKING GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN LOGISTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D FACTORS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF VEKA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVENOAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF JEF XPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDELL KEVIN LIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF BPV TRANSPORTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECAPITAL FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF BEST CHOICE LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSP TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVIS AND JONES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF KBM ENTERPRISES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST LINE FUNDING GROUP ASSIGNEE OF POWER BY LOGISTICS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLMJ TRANSPORT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOEHN CONTRACTING SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUBLE C SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUICK PAY FUNDING ASSIGNEE OF ASL TRANSPORT AND SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF E UNITED EXPRESS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BABAK KHAMOUSHIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF FLIGHT LOGISTICS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRK GROUP INC. doing business as TRK GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEBER TRANSPORT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNBELT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF MX6 TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JUAN P VARGAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAHA TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVENOAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF ROBLES TRANSPORTATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF USA EAGLE TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAST WAY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX CAPITAL CORP ASSIGNEE OF ALL N TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF AFC TRANSPORT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF EAGLE EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATALYST LOGISTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF ANGULO TRANSPORTATION SERVICE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF NUFY TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAD DRIVER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST MOTOR FREIGHT OF PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOEX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL FREIGHT SYSTEM INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JADA TRANSPORTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUG DAVIDSON TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF STRATAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF WTWM TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKY TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAB BANK ASSIGNEE OF STEIN & SON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK SPILLMAN doing business as MS HAULING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF M&G TRUCK LINES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPASS FUNDING SOLUTIONS LLC ASSIGNEE OF MD PROGROUP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF RUN DIRECT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF 3 BROTHERS EXPRESS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASA CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION ASSIGNEE OF DNA STATE WIDE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED COMMERCIAL CAPITAL, INC. ASSIGNEE OF EL MARRO TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST LINE FUNDING GROUP ASSIGNEE OF NAIVIX TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE FARM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERITUR, LLC doing business as MEBA EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF J C SPECIALIZED LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF LPD TRANSPORTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICARS TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR E HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THROUGH TRUCKING LLC doing business as CARGOMASTER TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN E. SMITH doing business as SMITH FIRST TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF ADAM TRUCK LINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John T. Husk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?