NATIONAL CONSUMER VOICE FOR QUALITY LONG-TERM CARE et al v. AZAR et al
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA ADVOCATES FOR NURSING HOME REFORM and NATIONAL CONSUMER VOICE FOR QUALITY LONG-TERM CARE
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2021cv00162
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Scott, Olivia)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #7 Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before May 25, 2021, the defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 11, 2021. (lcrbw1)
March 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 5/25/2021, (hs)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meryl D. Grenadier, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Meryl Grenadier, AARP Foundation, 601 E. Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20049, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on Febr uary 4, 2021. (lcrbw1)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Riseden Bagby on behalf of CALIFORNIA ADVOCATES FOR NURSING HOME REFORM, NATIONAL CONSUMER VOICE FOR QUALITY LONG-TERM CARE (Bagby, Kelly)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Meryl D. Grenadier, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8139539. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CALIFORNIA ADVOCATES FOR NURSING HOME REFORM, NATIONAL CONSUMER VOICE FOR QUALITY LONG-TERM CARE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Naini, Ali)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Naini on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Naini, Ali)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, )
January 18, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CALIFORNIA ADVOCATES FOR NURSING HOME REFORM, NATIONAL CONSUMER VOICE FOR QUALITY LONG-TERM CARE (Su, Henry)
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8091154) filed by NATIONAL CONSUMER VOICE FOR QUALITY LONG-TERM CARE, CALIFORNIA ADVOCATES FOR NURSING HOME REFORM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons to Alex M. Azar II, in his official capacity as Secretary, HHS, #6 Summons Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, #7 Summons United States of America, c/o U.S. Attorney's Office, DC, #8 Summons United States of America, c/o Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice)(Su, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL CONSUMER VOICE FOR QUALITY LONG-TERM CARE et al v. AZAR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Olivia R. Hussey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Represented By: Olivia R. Hussey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Olivia R. Hussey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA ADVOCATES FOR NURSING HOME REFORM
Represented By: Henry Chao-Lon Su
Represented By: Kelly Riseden Bagby
Represented By: Ali Naini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL CONSUMER VOICE FOR QUALITY LONG-TERM CARE
Represented By: Henry Chao-Lon Su
Represented By: Kelly Riseden Bagby
Represented By: Ali Naini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?