THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL et al v. COCHRAN
Plaintiff: WEST ALLIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. D/B/A AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH, SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. ANTHONY HOSPITAL, COVENANT HEALTH SYSTEM, AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC., AURORA HEALTH CARE NORTH, INC. D/B/A AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF MANITOWOC COUNTY, SWEDISH COVENANT HOSPITAL, AURORA HEALTH CARE CENTRAL, INC. D/B/A AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF SHEBOYGAN COUNTY, AURORA HEALTH CARE SOUTHERN LAKES, INC., HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC. D/B/A AURORA SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, MERCY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, BAYCARE AURORA, LLC, WATAUGA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM D/B/A SUMMA HELATH SYSTEM - BARBERTON CAMPUS, SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM - AKRON CAMPUS, AURORA HEALTH CARE NORTH, INC. doing business as AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF MANITOWOC COUNTY, AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC. doing business as AURORA ST. LUKES MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF OSHKOSH, INC. doing business as AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH, SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM - BARBERTON CAMPUS, AURORA HEALTH CARE SOUTHERN LAKES, INC. doing business as AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA, AURORA HEALTH CARE CENTRAL, INC. doing business as AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF SHEBOYGAN COUNTY, WEST ALLIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as AURORA WEST ALLIS MEDICAL CENTER and AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC. doing business as AURORA SINAI MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv00205
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2021 Cases Consolidated. Cases 20cv2433 and 21cv205 have been consolidated with case 19mc190, pursuant to an Order entered 02/14/2021. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead/earlier case, Misc. Action No. 19-190 (zjf)
February 14, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint. It is ORDERED that the deadline for defendant to respond to the complaint is vacated and this case shall be stayed pending consolidation or further action on the Notice of Related Case.Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/14/21. (DMK)
February 14, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant has filed notices of related case for 78 Thorek Memorial Hospital v. Cochran, 21-cv-00205-ABJ, and 80 Sanford Health Network v. Cochran, 20-cv-3433-ABJ. A review of the complaints in the cases show that they present a number of claims, including challenges to the Secretary's treatment of Part C days in calculating their DSH adjustments in light of the Supreme Court's ruling in Azar v. Allina Health Servs., 139 S. Ct. 1804 (2019), and challenges to an August 17, 2020 rule implemented by the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services ("CMS"), CMS Ruling 1739-R. The Court has found claims challenging CMS Ruling 1739-R not to be related to this matter. See Minute Order (Feb. 14, 2021). Accordingly, for the reasons stated in the November 4, 2019 consolidation order, Order #1 , and the February 14, 2021 minute order, the Court finds that these cases are related, except for claims challenging CMS Ruling 1739-R. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate these two cases into In re Allina II-Type DSH Adjustment Cases, 19-mc-190, excluding the claims challenging CMS Ruling 1739-R: Count II in Thorek Memorial Hospital, 21-cv-00205-ABJ, and Count II in Sanford Health Network, 20-cv-3433-ABJ. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall address these cases in their response due to the Court on February 16, 2021. See Order 74 at 10 (calling for a list identifying which additional cases, filed after defendant's motion for remand was filed, should be remanded for further action by the Secretary). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/14/21. (DMK)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by NORRIS COCHRAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter). Added MOTION to Vacate on 2/16/2021 (znmw).
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NORRIS COCHRAN. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-00190. (Bryce, Peter)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of NORRIS COCHRAN (Bryce, Peter)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NORRIS COCHRAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 25, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-190. (Ruskin, Andrew)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AURORA HEALTH CARE CENTRAL, INC., AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC.(D/B/A AURORA SINAI MEDICAL CENTER), AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC.(AURORA ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER), AURORA HEALTH CARE NORTH, INC., AURORA HEALTH CARE SOUTHERN LAKES, INC., BAYCARE AURORA, LLC, COVENANT HEALTH SYSTEM, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, MERCY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ST. ANTHONY HOSPITAL, SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM(D/B/A SUMMA HELATH SYSTEM - BARBERTON CAMPUS), SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM(Summa Health System - Akron Campus), SWEDISH COVENANT HOSPITAL, THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, WATAUGA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WEST ALLIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. (Ruskin, Andrew)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8112295) filed by HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, AURORA HEALTH CARE CENTRAL, INC., WATAUGA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYCARE AURORA, LLC, THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SWEDISH COVENANT HOSPITAL, COVENANT HEALTH SYSTEM, AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC.(D/B/A AURORA SINAI MEDICAL CENTER), SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM(D/B/A SUMMA HELATH SYSTEM - BARBERTON CAMPUS), AURORA HEALTH CARE SOUTHERN LAKES, INC., ST. ANTHONY HOSPITAL, JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, MERCY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC.(AURORA ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER), SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM(Summa Health System - Akron Campus), WEST ALLIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., AURORA HEALTH CARE NORTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cochran summons, #3 Summons Sherwin summons, #4 Summons Wilkinson summons, #5 Exhibit Ex. 1 Decision)(Ruskin, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL et al v. COCHRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST ALLIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. D/B/A AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. ANTHONY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COVENANT HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC.
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA HEALTH CARE NORTH, INC. D/B/A AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF MANITOWOC COUNTY
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWEDISH COVENANT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA HEALTH CARE CENTRAL, INC. D/B/A AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF SHEBOYGAN COUNTY
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA HEALTH CARE SOUTHERN LAKES, INC.
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC. D/B/A AURORA SINAI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYCARE AURORA, LLC
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATAUGA MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM D/B/A SUMMA HELATH SYSTEM - BARBERTON CAMPUS
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM - AKRON CAMPUS
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA HEALTH CARE NORTH, INC. doing business as AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF MANITOWOC COUNTY
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC. doing business as AURORA ST. LUKES MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF OSHKOSH, INC. doing business as AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM - BARBERTON CAMPUS
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA HEALTH CARE SOUTHERN LAKES, INC. doing business as AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA HEALTH CARE CENTRAL, INC. doing business as AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF SHEBOYGAN COUNTY
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST ALLIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as AURORA WEST ALLIS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA HEALTH CARE METRO, INC. doing business as AURORA SINAI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?