PETTAWAY/PETTIGREW v. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Plaintiff: WAYNE PETTAWAY/PETTIGREW
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 1:2021cv00234
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Receipt on 3/2/2021 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 21-cv-79 sent by Western District of Pennsylvania. (adh, ) Modified on 3/4/2021 (adh, ).
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred to the USDC for the Western District of Pennsylvania, pursuant to the Court Order entered 1/29/2021. Sent to Court via Electronically. (adh, ) (adh, ).
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 2/18/2021.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/29/2021. (adh, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WAYNE PETTAWAY/PETTIGREW. (adh, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by WAYNE PETTAWAY/PETTIGREW.(adh, )
January 22, 2021 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 1/22/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETTAWAY/PETTIGREW v. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE PETTAWAY/PETTIGREW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?