ALTA BATES MEDICAL CENTER et al v. COCHRAN
Plaintiff: SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER - SACRAMENTO, MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER SANTA ROSA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, ALTA BATES MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS HOSPITAL doing business as CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - DAVIES CAMPUS HOSPITAL doing business as CPMC R.K. DAVIES, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKE'S CAMPUS HOSPITAL doing business as ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER and UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA doing business as U.C. DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as UCSF MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv00297
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/9/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/10/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/16/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NORRIS COCHRAN served on 2/16/2021 (Webster, Stephanie)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/4/21. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NORRIS COCHRAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
February 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALTA BATES MEDICAL CENTER, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - DAVIES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKE'S CAMPUS HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER - SACRAMENTO, SUTTER SANTA ROSA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA (Webster, Stephanie)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORRIS COCHRAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8150450) filed by SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER - SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - DAVIES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKE'S CAMPUS HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER SANTA ROSA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, ALTA BATES MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALTA BATES MEDICAL CENTER et al v. COCHRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER - SACRAMENTO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER SANTA ROSA REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTA BATES MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS HOSPITAL doing business as CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - DAVIES CAMPUS HOSPITAL doing business as CPMC R.K. DAVIES
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKE'S CAMPUS HOSPITAL doing business as ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA doing business as U.C. DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as UCSF MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?